This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/27/2021 at 11:11:47 (UTC).

PEICK & CLELAND

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 PEICK CLELAND was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Nicholas Firetag. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5713

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Nicholas Firetag

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WESTON PEICK

Respondent

KELLY CLELAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Diane Michelle Singleton-Smith

Respondent Attorney

Amanda Beth Naples

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Fee for eSubmit (SAP 821157); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/22/2021; Fine Description: eSubmit *2560 Receipt No.: 20210922-00772.1; Paid: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingType: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Judicial Officer: Nicholas Firetag; Location/Courtroom: Department H4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • JudgementDissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Disposition: Judgment for Dissolution (FL-180); Disposition Type: Judgment/Order; Details; Marital Status/Domestic Partnership ends: 08/20/2021; Status: Full Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Entry of Judgment on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment for Dissolution (FL-180) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure (FL-144); Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Appearance, Stipulation and Waiver (Respondent made general appearance); Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Response to Petition for Dissolution, Legal Separation, or Nullity. (FL-120) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Filed By: KELLY CLELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Document Return.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service of Summons (FL-115) on Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Petition or other first paper (including a joint petition) for dissolution of marriage or domestic partnership, legal separation, or nullity (GC70670B); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/07/2020; Fine Description: eSubmit *8009 Receipt No.: 20201207-00210.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Family Law Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Residence (RI-FL036); Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage FL-100; Filed By: WESTON PEICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketFilings: Dissolution of Marriage Without Child(ren) filed by WESTON PEICK; Disposition: Judgment/Order 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAPLES AMANDA BETH