This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/30/2019 at 23:03:37 (UTC).

PDQ INVESTMENTS LLC & AGUIRRE

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 PDQ INVESTMENTS LLC AGUIRRE was filed as a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1648

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PDQ INVESTMENTS LLC AS TRUSTEEFOR ORADON

Defendant

BRIDGETTE AGUIRRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMIS, MICOLE

27372 Aliso Creek Rd., Ste 230

Aliso Viejo, CA 92656

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POST

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE SAMRA ROTH FURBUSH FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/27/2019 OF PDQ INVESTMENTS LLCAS TRUSTEEFOR ORADON AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; HONORABLE SAMRA ROTH FURBUSH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY PDQ INVESTMENTS LLCAS TRUSTEEFOR ORADON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/28/19 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92545.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/27/2019 OF PDQ INVESTMENTS LLCAS TRUSTEEFOR ORADON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PDQ INVESTMENTS LLC AS TRUSTEE FOR AVENIDA VAQUERO TRUST #425 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMIS, MICOLE E