This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/21/2021 at 18:22:02 (UTC).

PAZ vs ZAMISKI

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 PAZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAMISKI. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3912

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

SABRINA PAZ

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DAVID ZAMISKI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF FERNANDO D VARGAS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF FERNANDO D VARGAS

8647 Haven Avenue Suite 200

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle Dube Mittskus

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

08/31/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

08/31/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

05/21/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a)

Certificate of Mailing

05/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement

05/10/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

03/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Taking Motions Off Calendar

03/30/2021: Notice of Taking Motions Off Calendar

Declaration of Danielle Mittskus re OSC re Failure to File Timely Case Management Statement and Proof of Service as to Cross-Defendants

03/30/2021: Declaration of Danielle Mittskus re OSC re Failure to File Timely Case Management Statement and Proof of Service as to Cross-Defendants

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/22/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Motion to Compel Responses to Demand for Production of Documents, Set One

03/12/2021: Motion to Compel Responses to Demand for Production of Documents, Set One

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

03/10/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of PAZ as to DAVID ZAMISKI; mailing date of 10/25/20 filed.

10/27/2020: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of PAZ as to DAVID ZAMISKI; mailing date of 10/25/20 filed.

System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

10/05/2020: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

Summons Issued on Complaint of PAZ and filed.

10/01/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of PAZ and filed.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10/01/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement pursuant to Rule 3.1385(b); Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to SABRINA PAZ, LAW OFFICES OF FERNANDO D VARGAS; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal After Settlement (CRC 3.1385)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to SABRINA PAZ, LAW OFFICES OF FERNANDO D VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file a timely case management statement pursuant to CRC 3.725(a) as to Danielle Dube Mittskus, DAVID ZAMISKI; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause as to why sanctions not to exceed $1,500.00 or dismissal should not be imposed for Failure to file timely proof of service on all cross-defendants pursuant to CRC 3.110(c) as to Danielle Dube Mittskus, DAVID ZAMISKI; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint on Complaint of SABRINA PAZ; Filed By: DAVID ZAMISKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketFilings: Cross-Complaint of DAVID ZAMISKI; Disposition: Dismissal No ADR 03/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of PAZ as to DAVID ZAMISKI; mailing date of 10/25/20 filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/05/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #3066 Receipt No.: CV201005-0209-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PAZ and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of SABRINA PAZ

    Read MoreRead Less