This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 14:50:50 (UTC).

PAULEK VS CITY OF MORENO VALLEY

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 PAULEK filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF MORENO VALLEY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Russell L Moore and Russell L. Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2672

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Russell L Moore

Russell L. Moore

 

Party Details

Petitioners

FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLEY

ALBERT T PAULEK

GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

SAN BERNARDINO VALLEY AUDUBON SOCIETY

Defendants

HF PHASE II PROPERTIES, LLC

HIGHLAND FAIRVIEW PROPERTIES, LLC

13451 THEODORE, LLC

HF PROPERTIES

Respondents

CITY OF MORENO VALLEY

CITY OF MORENO VALLEY CITY COUNCIL

Interested Parties and Defendants

HL PROPERTY PARTNERS

13451 THEODORE LLC

HIGHLAND FAIRVIEW PROPERTIES

SUNNYMEAD PROPERTIES

THEODORE PROPERTIES PARTNERS

HIGHLAND FAIRVIEW

THEODORE PROPERTY PARTNERS

DOES 101-200

HF PROPERTIES

SKINNER PROPERTIES PARTNERS

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SUSAN NASH

BLUM COLLINSLLP

EARTHJUSTICE SHUTE, MIHALY & WEINBERGER CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

Attorney at EARTHJUSTICE SHUTE, MIHALY & WEINBERGER CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY

Interested Party, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Kenneth Boas Bley

Steven Borja Quintanilla

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause

08/09/2021: Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Vacates 8/9/2021 Order to Show Cause Hearing

07/27/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Vacates 8/9/2021 Order to Show Cause Hearing

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 7/27/2021

07/27/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 7/27/2021

Reply Brief Paulek, Declaration of Service

07/08/2021: Reply Brief Paulek, Declaration of Service

Reply Brief, Paulek

07/08/2021: Reply Brief, Paulek

Notice of Document Return.

07/07/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Order

06/24/2021: Order

Proof of Service

06/24/2021: Proof of Service

Third Joint Stipulation to Continue Briefing filed.

06/24/2021: Third Joint Stipulation to Continue Briefing filed.

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues all hearings set for 7/19/2021

06/17/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Continues all hearings set for 7/19/2021

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 6/17/2021

06/17/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re: Minute Order dated 6/17/2021

Request for Judicial Notice.

06/07/2021: Request for Judicial Notice.

Trial Brief

06/07/2021: Trial Brief

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing re: 5/10/2021 Status Conference

05/11/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing re: 5/10/2021 Status Conference

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order dated 5/11/2021

05/11/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order dated 5/11/2021

Amended Minute Order: Hearing re: Status Conference

05/10/2021: Amended Minute Order: Hearing re: Status Conference

Minute Order: Hearing re: Status Conference

05/10/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Status Conference

Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Why this matter should not be dismissed due to Petitioner's apparent Failure to effect Service within the applicable limitations period as to ALBERT T PAULEK, SUSAN NASH, FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLE

05/10/2021: Minute Order: Order to Show Cause re: Why this matter should not be dismissed due to Petitioner's apparent Failure to effect Service within the applicable limitations period as to ALBERT T PAULEK, SUSAN NASH, FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLEY

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Why this matter should not be dismissed due to Petitioner's apparent Failure to effect Service within the applicable limitations period as to ALBERT T PAULEK, SUSAN NASH, FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLEY; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Why this matter should not be dismissed due to Petitioner's apparent Failure to effect Service within the applicable limitations period as to ALBERT T PAULEK, SUSAN NASH, FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLEY; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Matter Taken Under Submission 31-60 Day Clock for: Court Trial - Long Cause; Expiration Date: 10/08/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Matter Taken Under Submission 31-60 Day Clock for: Court Trial - Long Cause; Expiration Date: 10/08/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Trial - Long Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Vacates 8/9/2021 Order to Show Cause Hearing; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Vacates 8/9/2021 Order to Show Cause Hearing; Judicial Officer: Russell L. Moore; Location/Courtroom: Department S205; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
364 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF ELECTION TO PREPARE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE filed.; Filed By: GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION TO RESPONSIBLE AGENCIES AND PUBLIC AGENCIES WITH JURISDICTION by GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE filed.; Filed By: GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF INTENT TO COMMENCE ACTION AGAINST CITY OF MORENO VALLEY by GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE filed.; Filed By: GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice TO THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF COMMENCEMENT OF ACTION by GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE filed.; Filed By: GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice OF REQUEST AND REQUEST FOR HEARING ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE by GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE filed.; Filed By: GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Writ of Mandamus-CEQA of GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of case assigned to Department 06 - Writ of Mandate CEQA. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Petition for Writ of Mandate (CEQA) filed. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketFilings: Writ of Mandamus-CEQA of GOLDEN STATE ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE ALLIANCE - Consolidated; Disposition: Dismissal After Other ADR 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIGHLAND FAIRVIEW PROPERTIES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FRIENDS OF THE NORTHERN SAN JACINTO VALLEY is a litigant