Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 17:08:41 (UTC).

PAUL KUSKE VS RICK PAGE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/11/2002 PAUL KUSKE filed an Other lawsuit against RICK PAGE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6828

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

RICK PAGE

PAUL KUSKE

FOES 1-50

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HOME DEPOT

NORMAN RICKETSON

RICK PAGE

FELIPE MARTINEZ

ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC

BUBBA DOE

IAN KIERNICKI

SING & SON CONCRETE RESURFACING

SNR TILE N MARBLE

HOME DEPOT USA INC

PAUL KUSKE

BROWN COMPANY

BUNDE ROOFING & ASSOCIATES

ARMOUR PLUMBING

37894 Melrose St

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NORMAN RICKETSON

ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC

Not Classified By Court

"INC027213 CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER"

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MCFADDEN AND ASSOCIATES

1111 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 209

Palm Springs, CA 92262

LAW OFFICES OF B PALMER RIEDEL

29069 Isleta Court

Cathedral City, CA 92234

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RUTTER HOBBS& DAVIDOFF

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

DONNER FERNANDEZ & LAUBY

4590 Allstate Drive

Riverside, CA 92501

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

200 West Santa Ana Boulevard Suite 801

Santa Ana, CA 92701-4153

FOWLER LAW GROUP

11845 Olympic Blvd., Ste. 710

Los Angeles, CA 90064

PIERCE & WEISS, LLP

3602 Inland Empire Boulevard Suite A-110

Ontario, CA 91764

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CONSOLIDATED CASE NUMBER

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2002 OF PAUL KUSKE AS TO IAN KIERNICKI; MAILING DATE OF 02/02/02 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2002 OF PAUL KUSKE SERVED ON ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/13/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ERIC KLOCKE

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC REPRESENTED BY PIERCE & WEISS, LLP FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MPAS IN OP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF MPAS IN OPPO TO MTN TO STRIKE & DEMURRER SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SERVED 07/16/02 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL

2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KUSKE FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KUSKE BY ARMOUR PLUMBING REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L DAVIS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ORDER ON DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED

ORDER ON DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE DOUGLAS P MILLER.

NOTICE REQUEST FOR MEDIATOR FI

NOTICE REQUEST FOR MEDIATOR FILED BY RICK PAGE

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L DAVIS FILED

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KUSKE BY ARMOUR PLUMBING REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L DAVIS FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REPLY TO PLTFS MPAS IN OPPOSIT

REPLY TO PLTFS MPAS IN OPPOSITION TO HOME DEPOTS DEMURRER BY HOME DEPOT FILED

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANC

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FILED BY ATTY FOR DEFT / ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KUSKE REMOVE ATTORNEY LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT L DAVIS FOR PARTY(S) ARMOUR PLUMBING AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION

PROOF OF SERVICE OF OPPOSITION & DECLARATION & SEPARATE STATEMENT SERVED ON INTERESTED PARTIES BY FED EX & MAIL SERVED 04/12/04 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/SUMMARY ADJUDICATION BY HOME DEPOT USA INC.

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANC

NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE BY HOME DEPOT USA INC FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2002 OF ERIC KLOCKENTEGER ELECTRIC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANA

NOTICE OF RULING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED FILED

126 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2006
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2005
  • HEARING ON OSC RE WHY UNSERVED PARTIES SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED ON 4TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KUSKE.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2005
  • FAX FEE PAID FOR REQ FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF B. PALMER RIEDEL PLFFS ATTY FROM JUNE 13 THRU JULY 6TH 2005 BY PLFF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING THAT THE SETTLMT W/PLFF & DEFT N. RICKETSON WAS MADE IN GF/GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE CHRISTOPHER J. SHELDON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY NORMAN RICKETSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FILED 02/05/2002 OF RICK PAGE FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
286 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2002 OF PAUL KUSKE BY NORMAN RICKETSON REPRESENTED BY DONNER FERNANDEZ &LAUBY FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF NORMAN RICKETSON REPRESENTED BY DONNER FERNANDEZ &LAUBY FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • TRUSTEE OF THE PAULL KUSKE TRUST DATED ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT FROM CASE # INC027213 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2002
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 01/11/2002 OF PAUL KUSKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2G FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 7/10/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - FAST TRACK

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brown is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant