This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/11/2016 at 11:32:04 (UTC).

PAUL KODET DDS VS TRANS WEST HOUSING INC

Case Summary

On 10/29/2010 PAUL KODET DDS filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS WEST HOUSING INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9783

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAUL KODET DDS

PAT KODET

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC

Attn: Chris Mccomic 13117 Quate Court Suite D

Poway, CA 92064

MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC

Poway, CA 92064

BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION

JD MECHANICAL INC

ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY

WHITE-RODGERS

WHITE RODGERS A DIVISION OF EMERSON

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION

JD MECHANICAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DONAHUE & HORROW LLP

1960 E Grand Ave Suite 1215

El Segundo, CA 90245

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

BAKER, CHRISTOPHER R.

329 S. Mccarty Dr.

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

LAW OFFICES OF CHRISTOPHER R BAKER

329 S Mccarty Dr

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

ROVER ARMSTRONG APC

75100 Mediterranean

Palm Desert, CA 92211

HENNELLY & GROSSFELD LLP

4640 Admiralty Way Suite 850

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET SERVED ON TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/13/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF P

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC FILED

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSING AND.

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT

NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC FILED.

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MOTION TO STRIKE/MPAS/NOTICE ON PAUL KODET DDS, PAT KODET WITH MAILING DATE OF 01/21/11 (NON-COMPLAINT)

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF P

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET AS TO BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION; MAILING DATE OF 02/11/11 FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STRIKE BY DEFENDANTS TRANS WEST HOUSING INC MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC & BRADFORD WHITE BY ATT FILED

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNS

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC BYLORBER GREENFIELD &POLITO FILED (FORM MC-051).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTO

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC BY LORBER GREENFIELD &POLITO FILED

DECLARATION OF CHRIS MCCOMIC F

DECLARATION OF CHRIS MCCOMIC FILED

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL

DECLARATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED ON PAUL KODET DDS, PAT KODET, BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION WITH MAILING DATE OF 04/04/11 (NON-COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DEFS TR

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF DEFS TRANS WEST HOUSING INC AND MCCOMIC CONS INCS MOTION TO STRIKE BY TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SERVED 04/04/11 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2013
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL OF TRANS WEST HOUSING INC LODGED IN FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • RETURNED MAIL OF MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC LODGED IN FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF TRANSFER TO PALM SPRINGS AND REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO PS2 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • FAX FILING BY BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 12/10/2012 OF BRADFORD WHITE CORPORATION FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2013 OF JD MECHANICAL INC FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 5TH AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAUL KODET FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • NPSC HEARING SET FOR 05/31/13 AT 08:30 IS VACATED -FOR THE REASON: NOT NEEDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 05/01/2013 OF JD MECHANICAL INC. (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LODGMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET AS TO TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC ATTORNEY LORBER GREENFIELD &POLITO ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSING AND.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO STRIKE SET 4/08/11 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT 2H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT BY TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC, MCCOMIC CONSOLIDATED INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET SERVED ON TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/13/10 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 10/29/2010 OF PAUL KODET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JD MECHANICAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases where White-Rodgers Company is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANS WEST HOUSINGINC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS COMPANY 1222 HAMILTON PARKWAY ITASCA IL 60143 is a litigant