Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 16:40:41 (UTC).

PASS GO PROPERTIES PROFIT SHARING VS LOPEZ

Case Summary

On 04/07/2016 PASS GO PROPERTIES PROFIT SHARING filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LOPEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1210

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST

Defendant

DOLORES G LOPEZ

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE O'CONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AS TO DOLORES G LOPEZ FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DOLORES G LOPEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/07/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/07/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/25/16

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • --ALSO ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/25/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT ONLY PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/07/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO DOLORES G LOPEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/07/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AS TO DOLORES G LOPEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/07/2016 OF PASS GO PROPERTIESPROFIT SHARING TRUST AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92557.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/06/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR