This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 04/29/2018 at 10:01:00 (UTC).

PAPAS VS. SAVE A PET

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 PAPAS filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SAVE A PET. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3407

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE S PAPAS

Defendant

SAVE A PET A CA CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BONDONI LAW GROUP LLP

301 N Lake Ave Ste 820

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorney

CRUSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZGASTON &

800 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

LETTER RECEIVED FROM BONONI LA

LETTER RECEIVED FROM BONONI LAW GROUP RE: REQ DISC MTNS OFF CALENDAR AND FILED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL REQUESTS

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPO

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO REQ FOR PRODUCTION FILED BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL COMPLIANC

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH RESP TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS FILED

DECLARATION OF KEVIN D CARDONA

DECLARATION OF KEVIN D CARDONA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER R

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPO

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESP TO FORM INTERROGS-EMPLOYMENT FILED BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS.

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER R

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS FILED

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPO

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESP TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - GENERAL FILED BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS.

DECLARATION OF KEVIN D CARDONA

DECLARATION OF KEVIN D CARDONA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESP TO FORM INTERROGS - GENERAL FILED

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS AS TO SAVE A PET A CA CORP; MAILING DATE OF 07/20/17 FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS BY SAVE A PET A CA CORP REPRESENTED BY CRUSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZGASTON & FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - RES74052; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS - RES74053; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES - RES74058; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES - RES74059; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH RESP TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES - EMPLOYMENT BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES-GENERAL BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS BY SAVE A PET A CA CORP REPRESENTED BY CRUSER MITCHELL NOVITZ SANCHEZGASTON & FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS AS TO SAVE A PET A CA CORP; MAILING DATE OF 07/20/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92240.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF LAWRENCE PAPAS AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 8/28/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY LAWRENCE S PAPAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less