Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 11:34:49 (UTC).

PALMS & SANDS VS BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/10/2015 PALMS SANDS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1190

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Respondents

BANK OF AMERICA CORPORATION

RECONTRUST N A

RECONTRUST COMPANYNA

BANK OF AMERICA NA

CITIMORTGAGE INC

Not Classified By Court

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH APPELLATE DISTRICT

Riverside, CA 92501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

CATANZARITE LAW CORPORATION

2331 W. Lincoln Avenue

Anaheim, CA 92801

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BRYAN CAVE LLP

3161 Michelson Dr #1500

Irvine, CA 92612

Not Classified By Court Attorney

COURT OF APPEAL FOURTH DISTRICT

3389 12Th Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGM

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS;MPAS; DECLARATION IN SUPPORT BY PLAINTIFF FILED

FILED: DEFT CITMORTGAGE INCS R

FILED: DEFT CITMORTGAGE INCS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE

NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL.

DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL NUMBE

DISTRICT COURT OF APPEAL NUMBER ISSUED E067080 FILED ON 10/21/16.

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING

APPELLANT'S NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL ONAPPEAL OF ORDER FILED 10/21/2016 OF PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC FILED BY PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. FORM OF THE RECORD: APPENDIX UNDER RULE 8.124

FILED: REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE OF

FILED: REQUEST FOR ESTIMATE OF REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT BY L. GONZALEZ (BROCK) APP-$25 RESP-$5

1ST AMENDED NOTICE TO PREPARE

1ST AMENDED NOTICE TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL

NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS FROM COU

NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPTS FROM COURT REPORTER LESLIE BROCK FILED.

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEA

REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING AFFIRMED; JUSTICE HALLER, MCCONNELL, OROURKE.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03

DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2015 OF PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC BY BANK OF AMERICA NA, RECONTRUST COMPANYNA REPRESENTED BY BRYAN CAVE LLP FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/10/2015 OF PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC SERVED ON BANK OF AMERICA NA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/27/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REPLY TO (BRIEF) IN SUPPORT OF

REPLY TO (BRIEF) IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLTFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY BANK OF AMERICA NA, RECONTRUST COMPANYNA, CITIMORTGAGE INC FILED

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADIN

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS BY BANK OF AMERICA NA, RECONTRUST COMPANYNA FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY B

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY BANK OF AMERICA NA, RECONTRUST COMPANYNA FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

FILED: STATUS REPORT RE: STATU

FILED: STATUS REPORT RE: STATUS OF APPEAL AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE UNSERVED PARTIES

FILED: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOT

FILED: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC SERVED ON CITIMORTGAGE INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/05/15 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR FROM COURT OF APPEAL FILED; RULING AFFIRMED; JUSTICE HALLER, MCCONNELL, OROURKE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • OPINION RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO JUDGE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO K SMITH DOC#1908104173, IN THE AMOUNT OF $14.40.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CATANZARITE LAW DOC#1908104212, IN THE AMOUNT OF $598.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO BRYAN CAVE DOC#1908104213, IN THE AMOUNT OF $2.80.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO CLERK OF THE COURT DOC#1908104171, IN THE AMOUNT OF $207.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO L BROCK DOC#1908104172, IN THE AMOUNT OF $28.80.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO L BROCK DOC#1908104172, IN THE AMOUNT OF $28.80.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • TRUST EXONERATION - APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
118 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2015
  • ON-LINE MOTION RESERVED ON BEHALF OF BANK OF AMERICA AND RECONTRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR DEMURRER ON 06/01/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT PS2 - RES44671.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE BY PALMS & SANDS OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant