This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/23/2021 at 10:46:23 (UTC).

PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS vs LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5020

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS

Defendant

LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALLAHAN & BLAINE APLC

 

Court Documents

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

10/23/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

10/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92270.

10/23/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92270.

Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

10/30/2020: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

Summons Issued on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS and filed.

10/30/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS and filed.

Proof of Service on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS

11/17/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS

Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters' Notice to the Plaintiff and State Court of Removal

12/11/2020: Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters' Notice to the Plaintiff and State Court of Removal

 

Docket Entries

04/28/2021

HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Assigned Judge; Location/Courtroom: Department PS2; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Defendant Liberty Insurance Underwriters' Notice to the Plaintiff and State Court of Removal; Filed By: LIBERTY INSURANCE UNDERWRITERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS; Filed By: PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS and filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/30/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: Notice of Case Assigned to Department PS2. (Palm Springs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/27/2020

FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/27/2020; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV201030-0043-V.1; Paid: $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92270.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Palm Springs)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketFilings: Complaint of PALM SPRINGS VILLAS II HOMEOWNERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less