This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 12:17:08 (UTC).

PACE VS THYSSEN

Case Summary

On 07/10/2013 PACE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THYSSEN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0990

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2013

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GARY W PACE

DON MICHAEL BAILEY

SEPISOLAR INC

ALLIANCE ENERGY AND MECHANICALINC.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MANFRED THYSSEN SR

KARIN THYSSEN

MANFRED HEINZ JR

ALLIANCE ENERGY AND MECHANICALINC

DONALD MICHAEL BAILEY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

HEATING & AIR TECHNOLOGY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BRAUN & MELUCCI, LLP

7855 Ivanhoe Ave. Ste 400

La Jolla, CA 92037

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF DAVID DREYMAN

2221 Camino Del Rio South Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92108

HOROWITZ, JEFFREY D

14156 Magnolia Blvd Ste 200

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

LANAK & HANNA

625 The City Drive South

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH CA

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH CASE NUMBER MCC1300984 BY GARY W PACE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE AS TO AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/13 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2013 OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2013 OF AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY AS TO DON MICHAEL BAILEY FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY G

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY GARY W PACE FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY M

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY MANFRED THYSSEN SR, MANFRED HEINZ JR, KARIN THYSSEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: OSC FILED

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ALLIANCE

MOTION TO/FOR COMPEL ALLIANCE ENERGY & MECHANICAL INC TO AMEND RESPOND TO REQUEST BY GARY W PACE FILED

DECLARATION OF OF WILLIAM J BR

DECLARATION OF OF WILLIAM J BRAUN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: COMPEL DE

NOTICE OF RULING RE: COMPEL DEFENDANT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS & MONETARY FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: CONTI

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: CONTINUE THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES BY GARY W PACE FILED

GARY W PACES REVISED MANDATORY

GARY W PACES REVISED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE AS TO AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AM

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR AMEND HIS TENTH CAUSE OF ACTION BY GARY W PACE FILED

NOTICE OF LODGEMENT BY GARY W

NOTICE OF LODGEMENT BY GARY W PACE FILED.

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ENTER

EX PARTE APPLICATION RE: ENTER JUDGMENT (SOUTHWEST) FILED.

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - BANKRUPTCY AS TO DEFENDANT MANFRED HEINZ JR FILED. (FORM CM-180)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/07/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS $1500/DISMISSAL/STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS UP TO $1500/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AS TO GARY W PACE, ALLIANCE ENERGY ANDMECHANICALINC; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SET 5/26/16, @ 8:30 IN DEPT S303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • FAX FILING BY GARY W PACE ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY GARY W PACE.

    Read MoreRead Less
231 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE AS TO MANFRED HEINZ JR; MAILING DATE OF 07/23/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE AS TO AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY; MAILING DATE OF 08/08/13 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE SERVED ON SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/06/13 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH CASE NUMBER MCC1300984 BY GARY W PACE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/10/2013 OF GARY PACE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (SOUTHWEST) SET 1/06/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. S303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 12 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S303 FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEATING AND AIR INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant