This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/17/2018 at 11:02:29 (UTC).

OWEN VS SPARKS

Case Summary

On 01/18/2017 OWEN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SPARKS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0111

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAUREEN L OWEN

Aguanga, CA 92536

Defendant

ALLISON K SPARKS

Aguanga, CA 92536

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 02/15/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MAUREEN L OWEN - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ALLISON K SPARKS IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON MAUREEN OWEN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/20/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF MAUREEN OWEN BY ALLISON K SPARKS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF MAUREEN OWEN SERVED ON ALLISON K SPARKS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/18/17 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MAUREEN L OWEN IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF MAUREEN OWEN AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92536.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 02/15/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - HEMET SET FOR 2/15/17, AT 10:00 IN H1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MAUREEN L OWEN - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY ALLISON K SPARKS (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ALLISON K SPARKS IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • FEE WAIVER FOR ALLISON K SPARKS WAS GRANTED FOR INITIAL; $255.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON MAUREEN OWEN WITH A MAILING DATE OF 01/20/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF MAUREEN OWEN BY ALLISON K SPARKS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2017
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 1/20/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWHE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MAUREEN L OWEN (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 3/20/17 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 01/18/2017 OF MAUREEN OWEN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92536.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less