This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 19:27:28 (UTC).

OVERMYER VS ELLISON

Case Summary

On 08/18/2016 OVERMYER filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ELLISON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1652

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VINCENT OVERMYER

ROSALA OVERMYER

Defendant

JACQUELENE ELLISON

Hemet, CA 92543

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

1001 E Morton Place #C

Hemet, CA 92543

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER BY JACQUELENE ELLISON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER ON VINCENT OVERMYER WITH A MAILING DATE OF 08/22/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JACQUELENE ELLISON IS GRANTED; CLERK R. MORALES (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY VINCENT OVERMYER, ROSALA OVERMYER - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER SERVED ON JACQUELENE ELLISON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/19/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) VINCENT OVERMYER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) ROSALA OVERMYER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/14/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 09/14/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) ROSALA OVERMYER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) VINCENT OVERMYER AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/19/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - HEMET SET FOR 9/14/16, AT 10:00 IN H1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER SERVED ON JACQUELENE ELLISON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/19/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER BY JACQUELENE ELLISON REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/17/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/18/2016 OF VINCENT OVERMYER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92543.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less