This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 15:08:05 (UTC).

OSMENT GRADING VS DEL FRANCO

Case Summary

On 01/25/2017 OSMENT GRADING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEL FRANCO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1558

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC

Defendant

NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN PRESTON

 

Court Documents

Legacy Minute Order: OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC/LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN PRESTON is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

09/14/2017: Legacy Minute Order: OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC/LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN PRESTON is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

10/03/2017: Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

Judgment by Default by Court filed 08/15/17

08/15/2017: Judgment by Default by Court filed 08/15/17

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC filed.

05/01/2017: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC filed.

Proof of Service by Office Deposit filed

05/01/2017: Proof of Service by Office Deposit filed

Declaration of Glen Osment President of Osment Grading & Excavating, Inc. pursuant to CCP 585 filed

05/01/2017: Declaration of Glen Osment President of Osment Grading & Excavating, Inc. pursuant to CCP 585 filed

Request for Entry of Court Default Judgment (Default Only previously entered) filed.

05/01/2017: Request for Entry of Court Default Judgment (Default Only previously entered) filed.

System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

03/14/2017: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

Request for Entry of Default ONLY on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to All Defendant(s) NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

03/14/2017: Request for Entry of Default ONLY on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to All Defendant(s) NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO; mailing date of 01/30/17 filed.

02/09/2017: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO; mailing date of 01/30/17 filed.

System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

01/25/2017: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

01/25/2017: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

Summons Issued on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC and filed.

01/25/2017: Summons Issued on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC and filed.

Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Riverside)

01/25/2017: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Riverside)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2017
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Shipping costs for transcripts for civil cases on appeal/Returning file stamped copies of documents by fax (CRC10.815); Amount: $2.00; Paid: $2.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/04/2017; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV171004-0074-V.1; Paid: $2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Acknowledgment of FULL Satisfaction of Judgment for Judgment Debtor, NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • HearingType: OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC/LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN PRESTON is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Legacy Minute Order: OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC/LAW OFFICE OF JONATHAN PRESTON is ordered to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • JudgementStatus: Entered; Type: Money; Applies to: Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC; For/Against: Against - NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO; Details; Principal: $20,000.00; Costs: $470.00; Accrued Interest: $991.88; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Other: $0.00; Subtotal Judgment: $21,461.88; Total: $21,461.88

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Judgment by Default by Court filed 08/15/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil.; Location/Courtroom: Department 11; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • DocketStatus: Proposed; Description: Proposed Judgment submitted by OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC on 05/01/17.; Filed By: OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC; Confidential: YES Confidential

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Office Deposit filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default ONLY on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to All Defendant(s) NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service (Sub-Served and Mailed) on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC as to NICHOLAS DEL FRANCO; mailing date of 01/30/17 filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Shipping costs for transcripts for civil cases on appeal/Returning file stamped copies of documents by fax (CRC10.815); Amount: $32.00; Paid: $32.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2017; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV170126-0199-V.1; Paid: $32.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount over $10,000 up to $25,000 (GC70613A); Amount: $395.00; Paid: $395.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/26/2017; Fine Description: Visa Receipt No.: CV170126-0192-V.1; Paid: $395.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92562.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC and filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil - General Civil Complaint - Over $10K/Under $25K filed. (Riverside)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of OSMENT GRADING & EXCAVATING INC; Disposition: Complete 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less