This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/08/2018 at 10:30:53 (UTC).

OSCAR L. LARIOS VS. JOEL SANTIAGO

Case Summary

On 10/19/2006 OSCAR L LARIOS filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against JOEL SANTIAGO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4041

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATER DISTRICT

Appellant and Defendant

JOEL SANTIAGO

Other

TEMECULA COURT

Temecula, CA 92591

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

GOKOO, ROBERT J

250 North Golden Circle Ste 107

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WALTER GREENE, JR

24012 Calle De Plata Ste 450

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Other Attorney

TEMECULA COURT

41002 County Center Dr.

Temecula, CA 92591

 

Court Documents

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE

REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 04/25/07 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. RESPONDENT ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL SHALL RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL)

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION

FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION

FILE: APPLICATION FOR PERMISSI

FILE: APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE AN OVERSIZED BRIEF-GRANTED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AN

NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NTC

FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NTC OF APPEAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • REMITTITUR ISSUED BY APPELLATE DEPARTMENT (DECISION OR ORDER OF 04/25/07 HAS NOW BECOME FINAL. RESPONDENT ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL SHALL RECOVER COSTS ON APPEAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: PER CURIAM OPINION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2007
  • COURTS SUBSEQUENT RULING ON 04/06/07 @ 01:30 FOR DEPARTMENT 62A; Disposition: Court's Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2007
  • FILE: SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2007
  • HEARING ON APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 09/28/06 (TEC058066).; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2007
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED BY JOEL SANTIAGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF DUE 2/16/07 AT 8:00 IN DEPTAPP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2007
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF FILED BY ELSINORE VALLEY MUNICIPAL WATERDISTRICT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE AN OVERSIZED BRIEF-GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • EX PARTE HEARING SET ON 1/29/07 AT 8:30 IN DEPT 62A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2007
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE APPLICATION FOR PERMISSION TO FILE OVERSIZED BRIEF.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • RESPONDENT'S BRIEF DUE 2/06/07 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2007
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY JOEL SANTIAGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2007
  • APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF DUE 1/31/07 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. APP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2007
  • HEARING ON APPEAL IS SET FOR 4/06/07 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 62A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APPEAL AND FILING OF BRIEFS. (USE NHA - NHA1 NOT USED SINCE 07/09)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • FILE: NOTIFICATION FILING NTC OF APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • APPEAL FROM JUDGMENT OF 09/28/06 (TEC058066)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2006
  • TEMECULA JUDICIAL DISTRICT (TEC058066).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Elsinore Valley Municipal Water District is a litigant