This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 23:01:47 (UTC).

OSBORNE VS THOMPSON

Case Summary

On 03/07/2018 OSBORNE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4541

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BLAKE OSBORNE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHARLES THOMSPON

THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC

Cross Defendant

FRANCISCO VILLALOBOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRAD HUSEN

2200 Vesper Circle Ste.F7

Corona, CA 92879

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER

11900 W Olympic Blvd #800 Po Box 64704

Los Angeles, CA 90064-0704

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY BLAKE OSBORNE.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLAKE OSBORNE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE HEARING OF SEPTEMBER 4.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF CMC.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE AS TO THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC; MAILING DATE OF 04/02/18 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE SERVED ON CHARLES THOMSPON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/0

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE BY CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC REPRESENTED BY CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARLES THO

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC REPRESENTED BY CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/26/2018 OF CHARLES THOMSPON AND FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NT

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE AND FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL OF ANY PARTY NOT AT-ISSUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE HEARING OF SEPTEMBER 4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • COURT ON ITS OWN MOTION: RE HEARING OF SEPTEMBER 4 2018; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BLAKE OSBORNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY BLAKE OSBORNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • JURY FEE DEPOSIT OF $150.00 PAID BY BLAKE OSBORNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE BY CHARLES THOMSPON, THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC REPRESENTED BY CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN DEAN ROEB & BARGER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE SERVED ON CHARLES THOMSPON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/02/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE AS TO THOMPSON TRUCKING LLC; MAILING DATE OF 04/02/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF DEPT ASSIGNMENT AND CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 5/07/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/07/2018 OF BLAKE OSBORNE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92882.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NTC OF CMC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THOMPSON TRUCKING COMPANY INC is a litigant