This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 11:20:50 (UTC).

OSBORNE VS ALVARADO

Case Summary

On 03/15/2016 OSBORNE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ALVARADO. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0439

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLARENCE OSBORNE

Defendants

ELIA C ALVARADO

LUIS ALVARADO

RONNIE E ALVARADO

LUISA ALVARADO

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H G LONG & ASSOCIATES

634 Oak Court

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE AND FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE BY LUIS ALVARADO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON H.G. WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/21/16 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY LUIS ALVARADO IS GRANTED; HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE SERVED ON LUISA ALVARADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE SERVED ON LUIS ALVARADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE SERVED ON RONNIE E ALVARADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE SERVED ON ELIA C ALVARADO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE AS TO RONNIE E ALVARADO, ELIA C ALVARADO, LUISA ALVARADO, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CLARENCE OSBORNE - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CLARENCE OSBORNE.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 04/27/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 04/27/16 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY CLARENCE OSBORNE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY CLARENCE OSBORNE - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER - HEMET SET FOR 4/27/16, AT 10:00 IN H1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/17/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE BY LUIS ALVARADO REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/16/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/15/2016 OF CLARENCE OSBORNE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less