This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/06/2019 at 00:23:03 (UTC).

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS VS NEAL ELECTRIC CORP

Case Summary

On 12/19/2018 ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEAL ELECTRIC CORP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7851

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

NEAL ELECTRIC CORP

TRAVELERS CASUALTYAND SURETY COMPANY OF AM

CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP-CALIFORNIA LP

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SEBASTIAN JOHN PASSANISI

ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CLARK CONSTRUCTIONGROUP-CALIFORNIA LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHOLEFIELD PC CONSTRUCTION LAW

13475 Danielson St Suite 100

Poway, CA 92064

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THE LAW OFFICES OFGREGORY R SHAUGHNESSY

55 Main Street

Tiburon, CA 94920

PROCOPIO CORY HARGREAVES & SAVITCH

12544 High Bluff Dr., Ste. 300

San Diego, CA 92130

PILLSBURY WINTHROPSHAW PITTMAN LLP

Four Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

MILTNER & MENCK APC

402 West Broadway #800

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PILLSBURY WINTHROPSHAW PITTMAN LLP

Four Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

LEE, ELAINE Y

725 S Figueroa Street Suite 2800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5406

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF RE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON SEE LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/23/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 06/14/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY O

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC SERVED ON ST PAUL FIRE AND MARINE INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/14/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC SERVED ON FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/14/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC AS TO SEBASTIAN JOHN PASSANISI; MAILING DATE OF 05/17/19 FILED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MATTERS UNDER SUBMISSION RULINGS.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC AND FILED.

REPLY TO /IN SUPP OF APP F/PRE

REPLY TO /IN SUPP OF APP F/PREJUDGMT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC FILED

SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPP OF A

SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPP OF APP F/PREJUDGMT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED.

DECLARATION OF JANET SUTHERLAN

DECLARATION OF JANET SUTHERLAND IN SUPP OF ZURICH AMERICAN OPPO TO APP F/PREJUDGMENT WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEAR

NOTICE OF APPLICATION AND HEARING FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER/ WRIT OF ATTACHMENT FILED BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC AS TO ZUICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

DECLARATION OF PAMELA J SCHOLE

DECLARATION OF PAMELA J SCHOLEFIELD IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE SANCTIONS & FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR LE

EX PARTE APPLICATION TO/FOR LEAVE TO AMEND 1ST AMENDED&REQ TO TAKE OSC OFF BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC FILED

MINUTE ORDER: DICLOSURE

MINUTE ORDER: DICLOSURE

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF /E

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF /EMAIL;MOTION;POINTS AND AUTH;DECL ON SEE ATTACHED LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 03/22/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC SERVED ON COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AM

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC SERVED ON SEBASTIAN JOHN PASSANISI WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/14/2019 OF NEAL ELECTRIC CORP FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC FILED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON SEE LIST WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/23/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 (05B*RMCCOND) FORM CM-200.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385(C) SET 11/13/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 01.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF OSC HEARING REGARDING DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
164 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC FILED. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • FAX FILING BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • FAX FILING BY ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/19/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/19/2018 OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92201.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/19/2018 OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC AS TO ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC CHANGE ATTORNEY SCHOLEFIELD P C-CONSTRUCTION LAW TO ATTORNEY SCHOLEFIELD PC CONSTRUCTION LAW.

    Read MoreRead Less