Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2021 at 08:51:12 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL VS JESSICA

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JESSICA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3524

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

TELLES M JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NELSON & KENNARD

Attorney at NELSON & KENNARD

5011 Dudley Blvd Bldg 250 Bay G

Mcclellan, CA 95652

 

Court Documents

Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

07/27/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

Certificate of Mailing

07/27/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

07/27/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Notice of Document Return.

06/04/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Amended Proof of Service filed on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC as to TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20. on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

08/31/2020: Amended Proof of Service filed on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC as to TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20. on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC served on TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

08/06/2020: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC served on TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

07/20/2020: System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

07/20/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557.

Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC and filed.

07/20/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC and filed.

Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

07/20/2020: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Default, Dismissal or Responsive Pleading as to ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be issued against Plaintiff for Failure to file Default Judgment pursuant to CRC 3.74 (Moreno Valley); Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Sanctions imposed Due Date: 08/30/2021; Amount: $250.00; Paid: $0.00; Balance: $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Awaiting Payment : ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Sanctions imposed Due Date: 08/30/2021; Expiration Date: 08/30/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDEADLINES & REMINDERS; Timestandard: Date to Pay for Sanctions Fee as to : ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC Sanctions imposed Due Date: 08/30/2021; Expiration Date: 08/30/2021; Status: Active

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Amended Proof of Service filed on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC as to TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20. on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC served on TELLES M JESSICA with service date of 08/01/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/20/2020; Fine Description: Check #623903 Receipt No.: CV200723-0216-CK.1; Paid: $255.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92557.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Limited Civil-General Civil Complaint for Collections Under $10,000. CRC 3.740 filed. (Moreno Valley)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint (Collection - Moreno Valley) of ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC SU is a litigant