This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 06:12:08 (UTC).

OMELCHENKO VS VISTA COVE

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 OMELCHENKO filed an Other lawsuit against VISTA COVE. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7653

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OMELCHENKO

HENRY S OMELCHENKO

Defendants

VISTA COVE

VISTA COVE AT RANCHO MIRAGE INC

HALLMARK FINANCIALSERVICES INC

VISTA COVE SENIOR LIVING LLC

FLOYD RHOADES

SEAN W BROPHY

LABRADOR CAPITAL LLC

BONAPARTE H LIU

JACK POYFAIR

REBECCA GIORDANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALLO, ARMIN RODRIGUEZ

41560 Goodrich St

Indio, CA 92203

Defendant Attorneys

WILSON GETTY LLP

12555 High Bluff Dr, Ste 720

San Diego, CA 92130

MORISON & PROUGH LLP

2540 Camino Diablo #100

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF

NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY HENRY S OMELCHENKO FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AS TO DEFENDANT BONAPARTE H LIU FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AS TO DEFENDANT SEAN W BROPHY FILED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AS TO FLOYD RHOADES, JACK POYFAIR, REBECCA GIORDANO REPRESENTED BY WILSON GETTY LLP FILED

ORDER FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION

ORDER FOR EX PARTE APPLICATION TO RECONSIDER IS GRA AND FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE RONALD L JOHNSON.

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTEN

EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PLEADING AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE IRMA POOLE ASBERRY.

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE M

MINUTE ORDER: CHANGE TO CASE MANAGEMENT CONF & OSC ON 8/21/19

FILED: EX PARTE APPL FOR COURT

FILED: EX PARTE APPL FOR COURT ORDERED SERVICE OF DOMESTI C LLC DEFENDANTS ON CA SECRETARY OF STATE

FILED: NOTIC OF VOLUNTARY DISM

FILED: NOTIC OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ONLY OF BONAPARTE LIU AND SEAN BROPHY

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AS TO FLOYD RHOADES FILED.

FILED: NON SERVICE REPORT AS T

FILED: NON SERVICE REPORT AS TO LABRADOR CAPITAL LLC

FILED: NON SERVICE REPORT AS T

FILED: NON SERVICE REPORT AS TO SEAN W BROPHY

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PL

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF PLA AFFIDAVIT/RESPONSE TO OSC ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/09/19 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

AFFIDAVIT /RESPONSE TO OSC RE

AFFIDAVIT /RESPONSE TO OSC RE SERVICE OF PROCESS BY HENRY S OMELCHENKO FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HENRY S OMELCHENKO

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO NAMING DOES 05 TO BE BONAPARTE H LIU FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO SERVED ON VISTA COVE AT RANCHO MIRAGE INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/19/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • HENRY S OMELCHENKO/ARMIN RODRIGUEZ CALLO IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE /SERVE ALL DEFENDANTS.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT - RES94328; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • HEARING RE: MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AS TO FLOYD RHOADES, JACK POYFAIR, REBECCA GIORDANO; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL BY COURT; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • HEARING RE: FIRST FRIDAY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE PROGRAM.; Disposition: Hearing Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO ARMIN RODRIGUEZ CALLO DOC#1910122218, IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO ARMIN RODRIGUEZ GALLO DOC#1910122215, IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • ESUBMIT FEE BY DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPO TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS BY FLOYD RHOADES, JACK POYFAIR, REBECCA GIORDANO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
89 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • FAX FILING BY VISTA COVE AT RANCHO MIRAGE INC, HALLMARK FINANCIALSERVICES INC ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO BY VISTA COVE AT RANCHO MIRAGE INC, HALLMARK FINANCIALSERVICES INC REPRESENTED BY WILSON GETTY LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO SERVED ON HALLMARK FINANCIALSERVICES INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/19/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO SERVED ON VISTA COVE AT RANCHO MIRAGE INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/19/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/12/2018 OF HENRY OMELCHENKO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92270.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/11/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less