This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/11/2018 at 17:30:04 (UTC).

OLAFSON VS AD BABCOCK

Case Summary

On 03/05/2002 OLAFSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AD BABCOCK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7698

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

APARTMENT CAPITAL PARTNERS

STEVE OLAFSON

MARTY COMBS

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

A D BABCOCK

Cross Defendants

GRUBB & ELLIS COMPANY A CORPORATION

STEVE OLAFSON

CLAYTON D HENRY

MARTY COMBS

WAYNE MARTIN COMBS JR

APARTMENT CAPITAL PARTNERS A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PISTONE & WOLDER, LLP

2020 Main Street Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

SHERWOOD AND HARDGROVE

11990 San Vicente Blvd. Suite 240

Los Angeles, CA 90049-5004

Defendant Attorney

MIDDLEBROOK KAISER& POPKA

801 E Tahquitz Canyon Way Suite 101

Palm Springs, CA 92262

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MIDDLEBROOK, GREG C.

1411 North "D" St P.O. Box 1319

San Bernardino, CA 92402

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION[LIS P

NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION[LIS PENDENS] FILED BY STEVE OLAFSON MARTY COMBS AND APARTMENT CAPITAL PA

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES (BY MAIL) SERVED 04/19/02 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS-COMP

PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES (BY MAIL) SERVED 04/19/02 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2002 OF A BABCOCK BY MARTY COMBS, STEVE OLAFSON, CLAYTON D HENRY, APARTMENT CAPITAL PARTNERS A CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY PISTONE & WOLDER, LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2002 OF A BABCOCK SERVED ON GRUBB & ELLIS COMPANY A CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/15/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FI

DEMURRER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2002 OF A BABCOCK BY GRUBB & ELLIS COMPANY A CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY SHERWOOD AND HARDGROVE FILED.

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF A.

MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF A.D. BOABCOCKS CROSS COMPLAINT BY GRUBB & ELLIS COMPANY A CORPORATION FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CON

NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS CONFERENCE FILED BY PLAINTIFFS

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF X-DE

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF X-DEF/MPA BY ATTY FOR DEF FILED

OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PO

OPPOSITION TO MTN TO STRIKE PORTION OF X-COMPLAINT/MPA BY ATTY FOR DEF FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRE

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER/MTN TO STRIKE ATTY FEES CLAIM BY GRUBB ELLIS COMPANY FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER

NOTICE OF RULING RE: DEMURRER & MTN TO STRIKE & NTC OF CONT STATUS CONF FILED

ORDER ON DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED

ORDER ON DEMURRER IS SUSTAINED FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE LAWRENCE W FRY.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING GRUBB & ELLIS CO DEMURRER TO BABCOCKS X-COMPL W/LEAVE TO AMEND FILED

MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE FI

MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT BY A D BABCOCK FILED

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. MILL

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL S. MILLER IN SUPPT OF TAKING MATTER OFF CA FILED

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2010
  • SUBPOENAED DOCUMENTS DESTROYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2006
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2005
  • HEARING ON OSC RE DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • FILED: RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • REFUND CHECK MAILED TO MIDDLEBROOK KAISER AND POPKA VCH# 43662, IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2005
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2005
  • TRUST EXONERATION - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • FILE SENT TO VOL 3 IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2005
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
160 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2002
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/05/2002 OF STEVE OLAFSON BY A D BABCOCK REPRESENTED BY M.S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES (BY MAIL) SERVED 04/19/02 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2002
  • -- AND CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 04/22/2002 OF A BABCOCK (CROSS-COMPLAINT) SERVED ON STEVE OLAFSON, WAYNE MARTIN COMBS JR, APARTMENT CAPITAL PARTNERS A CORPORATION AND MAILED ON 04/19/02 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2002
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT OF A D BABCOCK REPRESENTED BY M.S. MILLER & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2002
  • STAGE AT DISPOSITION - JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION[LIS PENDENS] FILED BY STEVE OLAFSON MARTY COMBS AND APARTMENT CAPITAL PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING SET 9/03/02 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 2J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2J FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grubb & Ellis Company is a litigant