This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 09/30/2021 at 07:22:21 (UTC).

OJEDA vs REGENCY APTS, INC

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 OJEDA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against REGENCY APTS, INC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Jackson Lucky, Harold W. Hopp and L. Jackson Lucky IV. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1876

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judges

Jackson Lucky

Harold W. Hopp

L. Jackson Lucky IV

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

ELIZA OJEDA

Defendant

REGENCY APTS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorneys

CARPENTER ZUCKERMAN & ROWLEY LLP

407 Bryant Circle #F

Ojai, CA 93023

Haytham Faraj

Defendant Attorney

Clayton Taylor Lee

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Form Interrogatories, Set One

06/29/2021: Notice of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Form Interrogatories, Set One

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by ELIZA OJEDA

06/28/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by ELIZA OJEDA

Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by ELIZA OJEDA

06/28/2021: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by ELIZA OJEDA

Reply in support of motion to compel further responses to request for production of documents and form interrogatories

06/17/2021: Reply in support of motion to compel further responses to request for production of documents and form interrogatories

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

06/17/2021: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Consolidated separate statement of disputed discovery responses in opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses

06/15/2021: Consolidated separate statement of disputed discovery responses in opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses

Consolidated opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses and opposition to sanctions

06/15/2021: Consolidated opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses and opposition to sanctions

Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

06/04/2021: Minute Order: Trial Setting Conference

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

05/18/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/28/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Department for All Purposes on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/23/2021: Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/23/2021: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/23/2021: Separate Statement in support of Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/23/2021: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

04/08/2021: Minute Order: Nunc Pro Tunc Hearing

Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Substitution of Attorney as to Eliza Ojeda filed on 03/12/21

04/08/2021: Corrected Nunc Pro Tunc Substitution of Attorney as to Eliza Ojeda filed on 03/12/21

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

04/08/2021: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

03/05/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingType: Court Trial - Long Cause; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Ruling re: Plaintiff's Motions to Compel Defendant's Further Responses to Request for Production of Documents and Form Interrogatories, Set One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by ELIZA OJEDA; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Held - Other pre-disposition hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • HearingType: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by ELIZA OJEDA; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Production of Documents by ELIZA OJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Hearing re: Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories by ELIZA OJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Reply in support of motion to compel further responses to request for production of documents and form interrogatories; Filed By: ELIZA OJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Consolidated separate statement of disputed discovery responses in opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Consolidated opposition to plaintiff's motions to compel further discovery responses and opposition to sanctions; Filed By: REGENCY APTS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Application and order for guardian ad litem ; Denied; Judicial Officer: Harold W. Hopp; Location/Courtroom: Department 10; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Application and order for guardian ad litem ; Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Application and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem ; Honorable Judge L. Jackson Lucky IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT IMPOSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/24/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #4190 Receipt No.: CV200624-0244-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92571.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of ELIZA OJEDA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGENCY APTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Faraj, Haytham