This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 20:20:09 (UTC).

OHRBORG VS SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 05/24/2016 OHRBORG filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1816

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEIF OHRBORG

Defendants

TRINIDAD SANCHEZ

MARCELLA SANCHEZ

Riverside, CA 92507

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AND FILED.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG BY MARCELLA SANCHEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARCELLA SANCHEZ IS GRANTED; CLERK J. MARCIAL (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 05/25/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO TRINIDAD SANCHEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/25/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MARCELLA SANCHEZ WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/25/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LEIF OHRBORG - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AS TO TRINIDAD SANCHEZ FILED.

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNLAW

STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LEIF OHRBORG.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • COPY(S) MADE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LEIF OHRBORG.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - MORENO VALLEY; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AS TO TRINIDAD SANCHEZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET 6/27/16, AT 13:00,IN DEPT. MV1UD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LEIF OHRBORG - MORENO VALLEY (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG BY MARCELLA SANCHEZ REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 05/24/2016 OF LEIF OHRBORG AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 7/25/16 AT 8:00 IN FWMV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT MV1UD - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (MORENO VALLEY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less