This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/19/2021 at 08:42:28 (UTC).

OCAMPO vs GIL

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 OCAMPO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GIL. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carol A. Greene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0597

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carol A. Greene

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Defendant

KATHIE KARINNA GIL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Hatch

Defendant Attorney

Scott L Macdonald

 

Court Documents

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

08/12/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing

08/11/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

08/11/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

07/29/2021: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

07/28/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Minute Order: Case Management Conference

07/06/2021: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing

06/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

06/23/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement

06/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

06/21/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Notice of Case Management Conference V. Alvarado on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

05/04/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference V. Alvarado on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Demand for Trial by Jury on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

02/18/2021: Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Demand for Trial by Jury on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

02/18/2021: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees

Notice of Case Management Conference

01/04/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Department Assignment

01/04/2021: Notice of Department Assignment

Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

12/21/2020: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Counsel.

12/21/2020: Certificate of Counsel.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement untimely pursuant to CRC 3.725 on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO; Filed By: KATHIE KARINNA GIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Carol A. Greene; Location/Courtroom: Department 2; Disposition: Continued Not Held - Court's Motion - Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Deposit of Jury Fees; Filed By: KATHIE KARINNA GIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Demand for Trial by Jury on Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO; Filed By: KATHIE KARINNA GIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 01/04/2021; Fine Description: Check #3809015 Receipt No.: 20210104-00250.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000); Filed By: CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Auto (Over $25,000) of CHRISTOPHER OCAMPO

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Hatch