Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/09/2021 at 03:36:29 (UTC).

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY vs MORGAN

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MORGAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Irma Asberry. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1999

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Irma Asberry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MELISSA ANN MORGAN

ALAMO RENTAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY F JOHNSEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF GREGORY F JOHNSEN

15335 Morrison Street Suite 100

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-1563

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL G GLUSKI

Po Box 52048

Phoenix, AZ 85072

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

05/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Order to Show Cause regarding Consolidation

05/26/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion Order to Show Cause regarding Consolidation

Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

05/17/2021: Mediator's Notice of Acceptance or Recusal

Case Management Statement

03/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

02/08/2021: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing

01/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Case Management Statement on Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

01/15/2021: Case Management Statement on Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

12/23/2020: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Response to Order to Show Cause

11/23/2020: Response to Order to Show Cause

System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

10/26/2020: System Generated Notice re: OSC WHY SANCTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED.

JURY DEMAND BY MELISSA A MORGAN

09/23/2020: JURY DEMAND BY MELISSA A MORGAN

Summons Issued on Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY and filed.

06/01/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY and filed.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

06/01/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Consolidation of RIC2001999 and RIC2002320 as to OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingType: Order to Show Cause re: Why Not Consolidate related case RIC2002320 WITH RIC2001999 as to OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingType: Court Ruling re: Order for Consolidation filed 6/4/21; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court Ruling re: Order for Consolidation filed 6/4/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Order for Consolidation of Actions; Filed By: OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration in Support of Consolidation; Filed By: OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion Order to Show Cause regarding Consolidation; Judicial Officer: Irma Asberry; Location/Courtroom: Department 5; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/28/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3756016 Receipt No.: CV200928-0214-CK.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: JURY DEMAND BY MELISSA A MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY by MELISSA ANN MORGAN represented by MICHAEL G GLUSKI filed. (Over $25,000.00); Filed By: MELISSA ANN MORGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 06/26/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #9193 Receipt No.: CV200626-0252-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: Notice of Department Assignment for All Purposes and Notice of Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of OAK RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMO RENTAL (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Oak River Insurance Company, as administered by Berkshire Hathaway Hom is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gluski, Michael G