This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/16/2019 at 15:10:49 (UTC).

NISKER VS VIP MOTOR CARS LTD

Case Summary

On 09/04/2018 NISKER filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against VIP MOTOR CARS LTD. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5336

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GERALD NISKER

Defendant

VIP MOTOR CARS LTD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL S GELLERINC

3576 Arlington Ave Ste 210

Riverside, CA 92506

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO D

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS4 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/04/2018 OF GERALD NISKER AS TO VIP MOTOR CARS LTD; MAILING DATE OF 09/11/18 FILED.

NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE A

NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/04/2018 OF GERALD NISKER AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET 9/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3 - RESCHEDULED TO:.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET 9/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS4.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS4 FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/04/2018 OF GERALD NISKER AS TO VIP MOTOR CARS LTD; MAILING DATE OF 09/11/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/04/2018 OF GERALD NISKER AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 11/07/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET 9/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. PS3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS3. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - OVER $10K/UNDER $25K FILED. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIP MOTOR CARS LTD. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PALM SPRINGS HYUNDAI is a litigant