This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 13:39:02 (UTC).

NINAJA VS JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 NINAJA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSEPH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0665

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hemet Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOURDES NINAJA

Defendants

JOANN JOSEPH

San Jacinto, CA 92582

STACY JOSEPH

San Jacinto, CA 92582

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

308 N Riverside Ave #2E

Rialto, CA 92376

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92582.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LOURDES NINAJA AND FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE MICHAEL J. RUSHTON (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LOURDES NINAJA BY STACY JOSEPH, JOANN JOSEPH REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER ON LOURDES NINAJA WITH A MAILING DATE OF 04/18/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY STACY JOSEPH IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY JOANN JOSEPH IS GRANTED; CLERK A.VALENCIA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LOURDES NINAJA REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) LOURDES NINAJA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT

JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECO

CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/10/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR FILED. (APPLICABLE UNIT OF MEDIUM WAS 05/10/17 H1 COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (HEMET) SET; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LOURDES NINAJA REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) LOURDES NINAJA AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM E WINDHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA - HEMET (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2017
  • FEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 4/14/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWHE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY LOURDES NINAJA (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/12/17 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2017 OF LOURDES NINAJA AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92582.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.