This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/19/2016 at 03:57:31 (UTC).

NIEVES VS COX

Case Summary

On 08/15/2012 NIEVES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COX. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0992

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IVAN NIEVES

Defendants

JASON COX

LANA COX

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WR

APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 09/07/12

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES AS TO JASON COX, LANA COX FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES SERVED ON LANA COX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/21/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWF

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES SERVED ON JASON COX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY IVAN NIEVES IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED (FORM RI-003).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR THE COUNTY OF RIVERSIDE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 09/07/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES AS TO JASON COX, LANA COX FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • DocketINITIAL FEE WAIVER FOR IVAN NIEVES TO BE RETURNED BY 08/20/12. (CLERK'S CALENDAR); Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES SERVED ON LANA COX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/21/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES SERVED ON JASON COX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/12 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • DocketCOURT REPORTER FEES ARE WAIVED FOR IVAN NIEVES PURSUANT TO INITIAL ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED ON 08/16/12. COURT REPORTER FEES ARE WAIVED UNTIL 10/17/12.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR IVAN NIEVES WAS GRANTED FOR FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER; $270.00 WAIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY IVAN NIEVES IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE SAMUEL DIAZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketFEE WAIVER RETURNED SET 8/22/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. FWBA.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY IVAN NIEVES (FORM FW-001).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED - BANNING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/15/2012 OF IVAN NIEVES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 10/17/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less