Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/22/2021 at 08:30:30 (UTC).

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION vs SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Craig Riemer. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2723

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Craig Riemer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTIONCORPORATION

NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

ROES 1 THROUGH 20

GEORGE KRIKORIAN

TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC

TMSGC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

T M S CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITYCOMPANY

TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

TMSGC

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

BUILDERS LAW GROUP

Attorney at BUILDERS LAW GROUP

9767 Via Roma

Burbank, CA 91504

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THE OPUS LAW FIRM

Attorney at THE OPUS LAW FIRM

662 Encinitas Blvd Suite 248

Encinitas, CA 92024

CLARK HILL LLP

Attorney at CLARK HILL LLP

1055 West Seventh Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BUILDERS LAW GROUP

Attorney at BUILDERS LAW GROUP

9767 Via Roma

Burbank, CA 91504

THE OPUS LAW FIRM

Attorney at THE OPUS LAW FIRM

662 Encinitas Blvd Suite 248

Encinitas, CA 92024

CLARK HILL LLP

Attorney at CLARK HILL LLP

1055 West Seventh Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

12/17/2020: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

Answer to Cross-Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

12/11/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC

Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

11/12/2020: Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

Proof of Service by Electronic Service of Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee De, LLC's Answer to TMS Constructon Inc X-Complaint with a service date of 11/12/20 on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

11/12/2020: Proof of Service by Electronic Service of Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee De, LLC's Answer to TMS Constructon Inc X-Complaint with a service date of 11/12/20 on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

Proof of Service by Electronic Service on the Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC served on TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC with service date of 10/26/20 filed

10/26/2020: Proof of Service by Electronic Service on the Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC served on TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC with service date of 10/26/20 filed

Notice of Amended Notice of Related Case by SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC, SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC filed.

10/15/2020: Notice of Amended Notice of Related Case by SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC, SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC filed.

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC as to SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC with receipt date of 10/13/20

10/14/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC as to SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC with receipt date of 10/13/20

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC as to SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC with receipt date of 10/13/20

10/14/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC as to SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC with receipt date of 10/13/20

Notice of Related Case(s) RIC2002934.

09/09/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) RIC2002934.

Answer to Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY represented by CLARK HILL LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00)

09/09/2020: Answer to Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY represented by CLARK HILL LLP filed. (Over $25,000.00)

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

07/20/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing; Judicial Officer: Craig Riemer; Location/Courtroom: Department 1; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Case Management Conference Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of entry of order consolidating cases for all purposes; Filed By: TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Cross-Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial on Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC; Filed By: TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Filing Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate; Filed By: TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to Cross-Complaint on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC; Filed By: SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC; SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Electronic Service of Showprop Menifee, LLC and Showprop Menifee De, LLC's Answer to TMS Constructon Inc X-Complaint with a service date of 11/12/20 on Cross Complaint of TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service by Electronic Service on the Cross Complaint of SHOWPROP MENIFEE, LLC served on TMS CONSTRUCTION, INC with service date of 10/26/20 filed

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of Lis Pendens (copy) filed by NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION.; Filed By: NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION served on AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY with service date of 07/29/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Proof of Service on the Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION served on T M S CONSTRUCTION, INC. with service date of 07/28/20 filed.(Personal Service) on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 07/21/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #9236 Receipt No.: CV200721-0047-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Non-Filed; Description: System Generated Notice re: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92586.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint of NIBBELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TMSGC is a litigant

Latest cases where TMS CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SHOWPROP MENIFEE DE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NIBBLELINK MASONRY CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant