This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 11/02/2016 at 18:04:25 (UTC).

NEXSTAR V LONE PINE CORRALS

Case Summary

On 07/18/2006 NEXSTAR filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LONE PINE CORRALS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3293

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEXSTAR LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOOM, RUDIBAUGH & JEGLIN

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEXSTAR LLC

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC BY LONE PINE CORRALS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC SERVED ON LONE PINE CORRALS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/27/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

ORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

 

Docket Entries

08/26/2010

DocketPAPER RECORDS DESTROYED/DIGITALLY ARCHIVED. PAPER DOCUMENTS/FILE DESTROYED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE POLICY/RECORDS MANAGEMENT A.10.400.1, PAPER RECORDS RETENTION AND DESTRUCTION SCHEDULE.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2007

DocketMAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE; MINUTE ORDER/JUDGMENT; REASON - NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, AS TO BLOOM, RUDIBAUGH & JEGLIN.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2007

DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 08/20/07.; Disposition: Dismissed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2007

DocketNOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF DEPARTMENT TO HONORABLE JUDGE MAC R FISHER IN DEPARTMENT 07

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2007

DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC AS TO LONE PINE CORRALS FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2007

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/12/2007

DocketOSC HEARING RE: WHY ANSWER OF LONE PINE CORRALS SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FOR FAILURE TO FIND COUNSEL; Disposition: Completed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2007
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY NEXSTAR LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2007

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Continued

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2006
View Court Documents

DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC BY LONE PINE CORRALS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2006

DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2006
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 07/18/2006 OF NEXSTAR LLC SERVED ON LONE PINE CORRALS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/27/06 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2006
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2006

DocketNON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 10/05/06 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2006

DocketDIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07 FOR ALL PURPOSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2006
View Court Documents

DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2006
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less