Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/20/2016 at 21:00:25 (UTC).

NEVINS VS MONACO COACH

Case Summary

On 05/10/2002 NEVINS filed an Other lawsuit against MONACO COACH. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4990

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAMERON T NEVINS

TERI F NEVINS

Defendants

ADVENTURES ON WHEELS INC

FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION

CATERPILLAR INC

SOUTHWEST COACHES

MAGNUM MANUFACTURING

CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY INC

MONACO COACH CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSNER LAW & MANSFIELD

10085 Carroll Canyon Rd

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RONALD S COOPER

4630 Campus Dr Suite 211

Newport Beach, CA 92660

SEDGWICK, DETERT, MORAN & ARNOLD

801 S. Figueroa St. 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5556

DAWSON & DAWSON

2660 East Coast Highway

Corona Del Mar, CA 92625

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON MONACO COACH CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS BY MONACO COACH CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DAWSON & DAWSON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS BY ADVENTURES ON WHEELS INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICES OF RONALD S COOPER FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 0

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS NAMING DOES =7 TO BE MAGNUM MANUFACTURING FILED.

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS RETURNED AND FILED.

STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO

STIPULATION OF ALL PARTIES TO SELECTION OF MEDIATOR

JURY TRIAL ORDER MAILED TO COU

JURY TRIAL ORDER MAILED TO COUNSEL

SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EXH

SEPARATELY BOUND VOLUME OF EXHIBITS FOR CATERPILLA RS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS BY CATERPILLAR INC FILED

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MANACOS M

NOTICE OF HEARING ON MANACOS MTN TO CONTINUE TRIAL - BY MONACO COACH CORPORATION FILED.

STATEMENT NON-OOPO TO MTN FOR

STATEMENT NON-OOPO TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

OPPOSITION TO DEFS MOTION TO C

OPPOSITION TO DEFS MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL BY CAMERON T NEVINS, TERI F NEVINS FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY CAMERO

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY CAMERON T NEVINS FILED.

ORDER GRANTING CATERPILLARS MT

ORDER GRANTING CATERPILLARS MTN F/SUMM JUDGE; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILE

JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS FILED .

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CATERPILLAR INC FILED.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2010
  • PAPER RECORDS DESTROYED/DIGITALLY ARCHIVED. PAPER DOCUMENTS/FILE DESTROYED IN ACCORDANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE POLICY/RECORDS MANAGEMENT A.10.400.1, PAPER RECORDS RETENTION AND DESTRUCTION SCHEDULE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2004
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING WHY DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SHOULD NOT BE ORDERED UNLESS JUDGMENT OR DISMISSAL IS ENTERED PRIOR TO 04/15/04.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CATERPILLAR INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY CATERPILLAR INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2004
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2004
  • TRIAL MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2004
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING CATERPILLARS MTN F/SUMM JUDGE; HONORABLE JUDGE SHARON J. WATERS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2003
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY CAMERON T NEVINS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2003
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Off-Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2002
  • ADVENTURES ON WHEELS INC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS SOUTHWEST COACHES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS BY MONACO COACH CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DAWSON & DAWSON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2002
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS BY MONACO COACH CORPORATION REPRESENTED BY DAWSON & DAWSON FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON SOUTHWEST COACHES WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON FREIGHTLINER CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/10/2002 OF CAMERON NEVINS SERVED ON MONACO COACH CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/21/02 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • NON PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 7/22/02 AT 8:00 IN DEPT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 06 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2002
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUMMINS ENGINE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FREIGHTLINER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant