This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/19/2020 at 23:25:52 (UTC).

NELSON VS ZAVALA

Case Summary

On 04/16/2019 NELSON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ZAVALA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Corona Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4483

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Corona Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL NELSON

Defendants

MARIANA ZAVALA

SAUL ZAVALA

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP

MANUEL MAGALLON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT J STROJ ESQ

166 Avenida De La Paz

San Clemente, CA 92672

Defendant Attorney

KEITH L SHOJI & ASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507-7425

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF BRADLEY R BLAMI

DECLARATION OF BRADLEY R BLAMIRES IN SUPP OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FILED

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SAUL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SAUL ZAVALA, MARIANA ZAVALA, MANUEL MAGALLON FILED

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON BY SAUL ZAVALA, MARIANA ZAVALA, MANUEL MAGALLON REPRESENTED BY KEITH L SHOJI & ASSOCIATES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON SERVED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/29/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON SERVED ON MARIANA ZAVALA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON AS TO MANUEL MAGALLON; MAILING DATE OF 04/28/19 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON AS TO SAUL ZAVALA; MAILING DATE OF 04/28/19 FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: AS

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON AND FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 91752.

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL

LIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (CORONA)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PRE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPOST UNCLAIMED - JURY DEPOSIT CCP 631.3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketTRUST VOID - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF BRADLEY R BLAMIRES IN SUPP OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON BY SAUL ZAVALA, MARIANA ZAVALA, MANUEL MAGALLON REPRESENTED BY KEITH L SHOJI & ASSOCIATES FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketTRUST DEPOSIT - JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY SAUL ZAVALA, MARIANA ZAVALA, MANUEL MAGALLON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON AS TO SAUL ZAVALA; MAILING DATE OF 04/28/19 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON SERVED ON MARIANA ZAVALA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/28/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON SERVED ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMP WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/29/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL - GENERAL CIVIL COMPLAINT - UNDER $10K FILED. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketLIMITED CIVIL CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT C1. (CORONA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE - LIMITED CIVIL SET 10/22/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. C1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 91752.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 6/18/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLEC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/16/2019 OF MICHAEL NELSON AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STROJ, ROBERT J