This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 18:41:43 (UTC).

NDEX WEST LLC VS MARDIROS MAZMANIAN

Case Summary

On 12/16/2011 NDEX WEST LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MARDIROS MAZMANIAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0060

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indio Larson Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NDEX WEST LLC

Defendants

JORGE LINARES

JOSE LINARES

JULIO CESAR NOQUES

PEDRO VALDIVIA

JOSE SEQURA

JOSE JESUS BLANCARTE

DAVID E SOLORZANO

THE SOCO GROUP INC

ELMS EQUIPMENT RENTAL INC

ADDINK TURF FARMS INC

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

STATE OF CALIFORNIA FRANCHISE TAX BOARD

CAPITAL ONE BANK

JESUS IBARRA

ED CRAMLET

LOWELL A WOODEN

MARDIROS MAZMANIAN

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENTDEVELOPMENT

TAX COLLECTOR OF THE COUNTY OFRIVERSIDE

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT E. WEISS

920 Village Oaks Dr Po Box 3269

Covina, CA 91722

Defendant Attorneys

REICH ADELL & CVITAN

3550 Wilshire Blvd #2000

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2421

SPIRO MOORE

11377 W. Olympic Blvd 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90064

ROLAND D. TWEED

7177 Brockton Avenue #444

Riverside, CA 92506-9828

ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

300 South Spring Street Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

STATE OF CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL

300 S. Spring St #1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

ROMERO LAW FIRM

6516 Bright Ave Bmr Professional Building

Whittier, CA 90601

Other Attorneys

GREENBAUMK LAW GROUP

840 Greenbaum Law Group Ste 720

Newport Beach, CA 92660

GALLEGOS, JOHN DAVID

P.O. Box 13621

Palm Desert, CA 92255-3621

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN D GALLEGOS

Po Box 13621

Palm Desert, CA 92255-3621

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON JESUS IBARRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON DAVID E SOLORZANO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON PEDRO VALDIVIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON CAPITAL ONE BANK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/22/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/20/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON ADDINK TURF FARMS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/27/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/1

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC BY TAX COLLECTOR OF THE COUNTY OFRIVERSIDE REPRESENTED BY ROMERO LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC AS TO ADDINK TURF FARMS INC, STATE OF CALIFORNIAFRANCHISE TAX BOARD, CAPITAL ONE BANK FILED.

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FI

AMENDED ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC BY COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COACHELLA VALLEY COLLECTION SERVICE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY N

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY NDEX WEST LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY L

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY LOWELL A WOODEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HYDRO-SCAPE PRODUCTS INC

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY L

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY LOWELL A WOODEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER

ORDER DISCHARGING STAKEHOLDER AND AWARDING REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS (GRANTED); HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN G EVANS.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC AS TO DEFENDANT TAX COLLECTOR OF THE COUNTY OFRIVERSIDE FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED - UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT CRC 3.1385 [FORM CM 200].

STIPULATION TO RE JUDGMENT FIL

STIPULATION TO RE JUDGMENT FILED.

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2013
  • RETURNED MAIL OF NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HRG RE:DISMISSAL LODGED IN FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • D#1002650093 10/19/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CK#3320048506 $30256.57 3/27/13 SENT TO ROLAND TWEED TRUST ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • TRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • TRUST EXONERATE-POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • TRUST DEPOSIT - POSTED INTEREST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • TRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CK#3320047262 $4000.00 2/28/13 SENT TO GREENBAUM LAW CLIENT TRUST 7629594370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • CK#3320047263 $34000.00 2/28/13 SENT TO CA EDD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2013
  • TRUST EXONERATION - INTEREST BEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON ROLANDO IBARRA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON JUAN RAMON ARGUETA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/23/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON HYDRO-SCAPE PRODUCTS INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON TAX COLLECTOR OF THE COUNTY OFRIVERSIDE WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC SERVED ON LOWELL A WOODEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/21/11 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/16/2011 OF NDEX WEST LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2F FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less