This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 00:13:27 (UTC).

NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS VS CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

Case Summary

On 12/07/2018 NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITY OF PALM SPRINGS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7579

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC

Defendants

CHRIS MILLS

BILL LA VOIE

GEOFF KORS

KENNY CASSADAY

LINDA DIXON

ROBERT MOON

GINNY FOAT

TODD HAYS

MARIA SONG

DAVID NEWELL

KEN LYON

CITY OF PALM SPRINGS

DICK BURKETT

LISA MIDDLETON

RANDY PURNEL

DOUG HUDSON

FLINN FAGG

JAMES WILLIAMSON

SEAN LOCKYER

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN RUDNICK

2211 Michelson Dr #700

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY C

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CITY OF PALM SPRINGS, JAMES ZICARO, FLINN FAGG, DAVID NEWELL, KEN LYON, GARY JOHNS, ROXANN PLOSS, DICK BURKETT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS ON REMAND IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE KIRA L KLATCHKO.

DECLARATION OF LEO J PRESIADO

DECLARATION OF LEO J PRESIADO PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3135 FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY N

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC, O & M HR LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

LETTER RECEIVED FROM US DISTRI

LETTER RECEIVED FROM US DISTRICT COURT (DATED 4/25/19) RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND FILED

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOV

NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC SERVED ON CITY OF PALM SPRINGS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/17/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CA

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (P

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2020
  • HEARING RE: STATUS CONFERENCE RE THE APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR STAY PROCEEDINGS ON REMAND IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE KIRA L KLATCHKO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY CITY OF PALM SPRINGS, JAMES ZICARO, FLINN FAGG, DAVID NEWELL, KEN LYON, GARY JOHNS, ROXANN PLOSS, DICK BURKETT FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC, O & M HR LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS ON REMAND SUBMITTED BY NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC, O & M HR LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC, O & M HR LLC FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF LEO J PRESIADO PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3135 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTER RECEIVED FROM US DISTRICT COURT (DATED 4/25/19) RE: ORDER OF REMAND AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC SERVED ON CITY OF PALM SPRINGS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/17/18 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 2/05/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS1. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92262.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/07/2018 OF NDC EQUITIES DOWNTOWN PS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less