Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 12:25:27 (UTC).

MURRIETA 144 VS CURRAN

Case Summary

On 03/14/2014 MURRIETA 144 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CURRAN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Temecula Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0572

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Temecula Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP

Defendant

RANDY CURRAN

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Road

Irvine, CA 92620

KIMBALL TIREY & STJOHN LLP

5510 Trabuco Rd

Irvine, CA 92620

 

Court Documents

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINE

LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

SUMMONS FILED.

SUMMONS FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RANDY CURRAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 03/27/14

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP AS TO RANDY CURRAN, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGME

DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEF

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT COURT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

DECLARATION OF RE: CLERICAL ER

DECLARATION OF RE: CLERICAL ERROR FILED

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR UNAV

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT BY MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT U

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED . SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT BY MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP FILED; HONORABLE JUDGE GORDON R. BURKHART.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • DECL/ORDER RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO ORIGINATING COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REVIEW - WESTERN (NON-APPEARANCE) SET 6/25/14 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. DJW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF RE: CLERICAL ERROR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT COURT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER CCP 585(D)) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP - DISPOSITIONED CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/14/2014 OF MURRIETA 144 APARTMENTS LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RANDY CURRAN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 03/15/14 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92562.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 5/16/14 AT 8:00 IN DEPT. T1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • LIMITED CIVIL UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT T1 (UNLAWFUL DETAINER (TEMECULA)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MURRIETA 492 LP is a litigant