This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 19:47:43 (UTC).

MUNOZ VS CAGE/HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 MUNOZ filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CAGE/HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Hemet Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1723

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS MUNOZ

Defendants

CINTHIA HERNANDEZ

ANDREW CAGE

DEJA CHERELLE CAGE

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARRETT, WILLIAM M.

463 North Sierra Way

San Bernardino, CA 92410

 

Court Documents

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LUIS MUNOZ.

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/04/16

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO ANDREW CAGE, DEJA CHERELLE CAGE, CINTHIA HERNANDEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO CINTHIA HERNANDEZ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/13/16

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 09/13/16.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO ANDREW CAGE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/13/16

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO DEJA CHERELLE CAGE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/13/16

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POST

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED; SIGNED BY HONORABLE COMMISSIONER KATHLEEN M. JACOBS.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; UNSATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LUIS MUNOZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 10/04/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO ANDREW CAGE, DEJA CHERELLE CAGE, CINTHIA HERNANDEZ, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO CINTHIA HERNANDEZ WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/13/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 09/13/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AS TO ANDREW CAGE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/13/16

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2016
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FEE PAID BY LUIS MUNOZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/31/16 AT 8:00 IN CLEH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/30/2016 OF LUIS MUNOZ AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92544.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketPREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT H1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (HEMET)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARRETT, WILLIAM M.