This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/25/2018 at 04:24:07 (UTC).

MOSS VS HALLECK

Case Summary

On 12/20/2006 MOSS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HALLECK. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Indio Larson Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3719

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANICE LEE MOSS

ROBIN M MOSS

SYLVIA A SARVAS

DAVID J MOSS

Defendants

MARIO PEREZ

TGH DIVERSIFIED INVESTMENT INC

DESERT VIEW WEST LLC

RE/MAX REAL ESTATECONSULTANTS

PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

THOMAS GEORGE HALLECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZSIMMONS & ASSOCIATES

610 W Ash Street #900

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

CHAPMAN GLUCKSMAN & DEAN

11900 W Olympic Blvd #800 P.O.Box 64704

Los Angeles, CA 90064-0704

LAW OFFICES OF BYRON G CORNELIUS

68457 E Palm Canyon Dr #7

Cathedral City, CA 92234

SEDGWICK DETERT MORAN & ARNOLD

801 South Figueroa Street 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5556

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - S

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/

SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER BY JA

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER BY JANICE LEE MOSS, DAVID J MOSS, ROBIN M MOSS, SYLVIA A SARVAS FILED.

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY STAY BY T

NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY STAY BY THOMAS GEORGE HALLECK, DESERT VIEW WEST LLC FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLA

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS SERVED ON RE/MAX REAL ESTATECONSULTANTS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/21/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY J

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY JANICE LEE MOSS, DAVID J MOSS, ROBIN M MOSS, SYLVIA A SARVAS FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES I

MEMO OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPP OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT OF DEF MARIO P EREZ BY ATTORNEY FOR DEF.

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASI

STIPULATION & ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS AS TO MARIO PEREZ; HONORABLE JUDGE RANDALL D WHITE.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MTN AND MTN TO DEEM MATTERS ADMITTED SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SERVED 12/17/07 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF MTN FOR ORDER TO COMPEL RESPONSES SERVED ON ALL INTERESTED PARTIES SERVED 12/17/07 FILED (NON-COMPLAINT)

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT OF MTN TO CMPL RESP TO FORM ROGGS (SET 1) IS GRANTED; HONORABLE JUDGE B J BJORK.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JANICE LEE MOSS, DAVID J MOSS, ROBIN M MOSS, SYLVIA A SARVAS

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY T

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY THOMAS GEORGE HALLECK FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF FITZSIMMONS & ASSOCIATES FILED (ADDRESS PREVIOUSLY CHANGED ON SYSTEM)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS AS TO DEFENDANT RE/MAX REAL ESTATECONSULTANTS, MARIO PEREZ FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C

CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 1C FOR ALL PURPOSES (NOTICE TO COUNSEL)

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS AS TO DEFENDANT PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2011
  • DATE TO SET OSC RE DESTRUCTION OF FILE (DISMISSAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2010
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE AS TO JANICE LEE MOSS.; Disposition: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2010
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE AS TO JANICE LEE MOSS.; Disposition: Advanced

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2010
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 1C TO 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • HOSC CALENDARED ON 04/07/10 IN DEPT. 1C. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 04/07/10 IN DEPT. 2F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • OSC HEARING RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE AS TO JANICE LEE MOSS.; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS AS TO DEFENDANT THOMAS GEORGE HALLECK, DESERT VIEW WEST LLC FILED WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • JURY TRIAL; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2009
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE SUBMITTED BY DESERT VIEW WEST LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2009
  • REJECTED DOCUMENT: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONT MSC SUBMITTED BY JANICE LEE MOSS, DAVID J MOSS, ROBIN M MOSS, SYLVIA A SARVAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2007
  • NON-PROOF OF SERVICE (NON-APPEARANCE) HEARING; Disposition: OSC SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS SERVED ON PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/02/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS AS TO MARIO PEREZ; MAILING DATE OF 01/02/07 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS SERVED ON TGH DIVERSIFIED INVESTMENT INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/03/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS SERVED ON THOMAS GEORGE HALLECK WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/03/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS SERVED ON DESERT VIEW WEST LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/03/07 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2006 OF JANICE MOSS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 2H FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2006
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLATTE RIVER INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant