Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 08/05/2016 at 16:44:53 (UTC).

MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST VS CARDENAS

Case Summary

On 03/26/2015 MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARDENAS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0105

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST

Defendants

BERTHA CARDENAS

MIGUEL MIJA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF GLENN H WECHSLER

1111 Civic Dr., Ste 210

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

AMENDMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

AMENDMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST NAMING DOES 1 TO BE MIGUEL MIJA FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/26/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO BERTHA CARDENAS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MIGUEL MIJA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/15/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/27/15

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT A

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO MIGUEL MIJA

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST.

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT O

FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT - WRIT OF POSSESSION AS TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY; SATISFIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2015
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO MIGUEL MIJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/27/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO MIGUEL MIJA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/15/15 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO BERTHA CARDENAS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 03/26/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDMENT TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2015 OF MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST NAMING DOES 1 TO BE MIGUEL MIJA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 5/26/15 AT 8:00 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B1 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST 2011-1 AKA MORTGAGE EQUITY CONVERSION ASSET TRUST 2011-1 MORTGAGE-BACKED SECURITIES 2011-1 BY U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS CO-TRUSTEE is a litigant