This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 15:34:32 (UTC).

MORGAN VS SAUBY

Case Summary

On 06/06/2017 MORGAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SAUBY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0899

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Murrieta Southwest Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC

Defendants

PETULA COLETTE GRIFFITH

SHANE SAUBY

ASHLEY MOORE

Lake Elsinore, CA 92532

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE O'CONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SHANE SAUBY; AND MAILED ON 06/10/17 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AS TO PETULA COLETTE GRIFFITH FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO PETULA COLETTE GRIFFITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/10/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC FILED BY ASHLEY MOORE ON 06/16/17 (SOUTHWEST).

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER

DEMURRER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC FILED BY ASHLEY MOORE REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER. ($10,000 OR UNDER) (SOUTHWEST)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY ASHLEY MOORE IS GRA; CLERK M LOPEZ (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AS TO ASHLEY MOORE FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/10/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/27/17

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • HEARING ON DEMURRER - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC BY ASHLEY MOORE (SOUTHWEST); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • --ALSO ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AS TO SHANE SAUBY, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 06/27/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 06/10/17 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AS TO PETULA COLETTE GRIFFITH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO SHANE SAUBY; AND MAILED ON 06/10/17 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/07/17 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/06/2017 OF MORGAN PICKS TWO LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92530.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less