This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/11/2018 at 11:48:51 (UTC).

MORGAN vs NATIONSTAR

Case Summary

On 11/21/2012 MORGAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONSTAR. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7149

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SOFIA M MORGAN

OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

NATIONSTAR N A

AURORA LOAN SERVICING LLC

CTX HOMES LLC

CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR

CENTEX HOMES

DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC

DAWG POUND LLP

DAWG POUND LP

CAPITAL BANK INC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIDEBOTTOM, MATTHEW T.

155 W. Washington Blvd., #1005

Los Angeles, CA 90015

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLFE & WYMAN LLP

2301 Dupont #300

Irvine, CA 92612

SEVERSON & WERSON

19100 Von Karman Suite 700

Irvine, CA 92612

ALEXANDER LAW FIRM

27201 Puerta Real #300

Mission Viejo, CA 92691

 

Court Documents

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF CENT

OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF CENTEX HOMES BY SOFIA M MORGAN, OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN FILED

NOTICE OF CONTINGENT NON-OPPOS

NOTICE OF CONTINGENT NON-OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS DEMURRER BY SOFIA M MORGAN, OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN FILED.

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR CONSOLID

OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR CONSOLIDATION BY DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONSO

OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION BY DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP FILED

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAG

NOTICE OF RULING AT CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC, CENTEX HOMES

MOTION TO/FOR CONSOLIDATE AND

MOTION TO/FOR CONSOLIDATE AND STAY UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION BY SOFIA M MORGAN, OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN FILED

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOL

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE BY DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SOFIA M MORGAN, OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SOFIA MORGAN BY CAPITAL BANK INC REPRESENTED BY ALEXANDER LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAIN

ANSWER TO 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SOFIA MORGAN BY DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP REPRESENTED BY ALEXANDER LAW FIRM FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY S

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT BY SOFIA M MORGAN FILED UNTIMELY PURSUANT TO CRC 3.725.

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SOFIA MORGAN BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED

DECLARATION OF OF KERRY W. FRA

DECLARATION OF OF KERRY W. FRANICH IN SUPP OF MSJ FILED

AFFIDAVIT OF OMER MOHAMMED HUS

AFFIDAVIT OF OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO MSJ BY SOFIA M MORGAN, OMER MOHAMMED HUSSEN FILED

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO M

REPLY TO PLTFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FO

NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FI

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC.

118 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (OTHER) WITH PREJUDICE X-COMPLAINT DAWG POUND PROPERTIES L AS TO DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AS TO AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2014
  • OSC HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT AS TO DAWG POUND PROPERTIES LP.; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY DAWG POUND LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2014
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY AURORA LOAN SERVICES LLC, MORTGAGE ELECTRONICREGISTRATION SYSTEMS IN, NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON THE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF SOFIA MORGAN FILED ; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; HONORABLE JUDGE JOHN W VINEYARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) IN THE AMOUNT OF $$4,040.00 BY NATIONSTAR MORTGAGELLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
341 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2013
  • FIRST APPEARANCE FEE PAID BY CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC (ON-LINE RESERVATION).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • FAX FILING BY SOFIA M MORGAN ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE SWC121829 BY SOFIA M MORGAN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2012
  • FAX FILING BY SOFIA M MORGAN ($1.50 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PURPOSES AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/21/2012 OF SOFIA MORGAN AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92563.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • DIRECTLY ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 07. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 02 FOR LAW AND MOTION PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK - SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less