This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 07/02/2020 at 23:26:17 (UTC).

MORENO VS CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY

Case Summary

On 11/30/2018 MORENO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7423

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY

34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC

CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE

CULLIGAN MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

HOTCAKES INC

ROES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALTER CLARK LEGALGROUP

71-861 Hwy 111

Rancho Mirage, CA 92270

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GRAVES & KING

3610 Fourteenth Street Second Floor

Riverside, CA 92502

HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES

3880 Atherton Road

Rocklin, CA 95765

LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK J CAMPBELL

3880 Atherton Rd

Rocklin, CA 95765

FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERMAN & BROWN LLP

215 N Marengo Ave Ste 165

Pasadena, CA 91101

FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP

1520 W Colorado Boulevard Second Floor

Pasadena, CA 91105

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/27/2020 OF CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE HOTCAKES INC FILED

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC BY CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE REPRESENTED BY FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/27/2020 OF CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE BY CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY REPRESENTED BY GRAVES & KING FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AS TO CULLIGAN MANAGEMENTCOMPANY INC; MAILING DATE OF 02/12/20 FILED.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 1

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO NAMING DOES 3 TO BE HOTCAKES INC FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT F

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC NAMING DOES 1 TO BE CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE TRIAL IS GRA; HONORABLE JUDGE CRAIG G. RIEMER.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE FIRST FRIDAY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCEAND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS DEN; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES BY CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILE

ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC BY CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY REPRESENTED BY GRAVES & KING FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 34031 DATE

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC REPRESENTED BY HOLLINGSHEAD & ASSOCIATES FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS

PROOF OF SERVICE ON THE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2019 OF CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY SERVED ON 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/13/19 FILED.(PERSONAL SERVICE)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/3

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO BY CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY REPRESENTED BY GRAVES & KING FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLA

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/25/2019 OF CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY AND FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED A

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AS TO CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY; MAILING DATE OF 12/13/18 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AND FILED.

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingDept: PS2; Action text: JURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketTRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingDept: 12; Action text: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 01/27/2020 OF CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE NAMING ROES/MOES 1 TO BE HOTCAKES INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO BY HOTCAKES INC, CULLIGAN MANAGEMENTCOMPANY INC REPRESENTED BY LAW OFFICE OF PATRICK J CAMPBELL FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 03/18/2019 OF 34031 DATE PALM DRIVE LLC BY CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE REPRESENTED BY FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AS TO CORELAND COMPANIESCOMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE CHANGE ATTORNEY FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERMAN & BROWN LLP TO ATTORNEY FRIEDENTHAL HEFFERNAN & BROWN LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketFILING FEE OF $450.00 FOR CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY IS WAIVED-EXEMPT PER GOVT CODE 6103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT OF CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY REPRESENTED BY GRAVES & KING FILED (SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVED AND MAILED) ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AS TO CITY OF CATHEDRAL CITY; MAILING DATE OF 12/13/18 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • DocketFAX FILING BY DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92234.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/29/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 11/30/2018 OF DOLORES DEL VILLALOBOS MORENO AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less