This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 12/20/2017 at 08:57:03 (UTC).

MOORE VS MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 06/28/2017 MOORE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MENDOZA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0182

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA MOORE

Beaumont, CA 92223

Defendant

RONNIE MENDOZA

Banning, CA 92220

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SA

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE AND FILED.

NOTICE OF NON STIPULATION TO H

NOTICE OF NON STIPULATION TO HEARING OFFICER JUDITH FOULADI BY PATRICIA MOORE FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON PATRICIA MOORE WITH A MAILING DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE BY RONNIE MENDOZA REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY RONNIE MENDOZA IS GRANTED; CLERK CATANO R (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PATRICIA MOORE - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RONNIE MENDOZA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/29/17 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UN

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER TRIAL.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION SERVED ON ALL ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS BY POSTING AND MAILING ON DATE OF 06/29/17.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) PATRICIA MOORE AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY WILLIAM E WINDHAM

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE REMOVE ATTORNEY WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) PATRICIA MOORE AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PATRICIA MOORE.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FILED. (FORM WG-035)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SATISFIED; RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PATRICIA MOORE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE REMOVE ATTORNEY WILLIAM E WINDHAM FOR PARTY(S) PATRICIA MOORE AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED 07/28/17; SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUDGE JORGE C. HERNANDEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 7/26/17, AT 1:30 IN DEPT. B201 - RESCHEDULED TO:.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NON STIPULATION TO HEARING OFFICER JUDITH FOULADI BY PATRICIA MOORE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: DECL AND ORDER OF JUDICIAL OFFICER SUBMITTED BY PATRICIA MOORE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 06/28/2017 OF PATRICIA MOORE AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 8/28/17 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92220.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less