Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/21/2020 at 07:38:27 (UTC).

MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP VS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 08/16/2019 MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GARCIA. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0206

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP

Defendants

RENEE MICHELLE SCHNEIDER

VIVIAN GARCIA

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HG LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR CONT

DECLARATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RENEE MICHELLE SCHNEIDER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO VIVIAN GARCIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OR

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HRG RE FAILURE TO COMPLY.

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY MOBILE HOME GROUP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUE THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE BY MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP FILED; HONORABLE HEARING OFFICER JUDITH M FOULADI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CASE - BANNING; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO RENEE MICHELLE SCHNEIDER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO VIVIAN GARCIA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/16/19 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketRETURNED DOCUMENT: TWO CHECKS #1216532 #1216535 SUBMITTED BY MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HRG RE FAILURE TO COMPLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE SET 11/20/19 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. B201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketDATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 08/16/2019 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketHEARING RE: UD OSC SET 10/15/19 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP is a litigant