Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 03/17/2016 at 11:57:58 (UTC).

MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP VS CORLIS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CORLIS. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Banning Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0436

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Banning Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP

Defendants

KAY CORLIS

KATRINA ANN CORLIS

Cherry Valley, CA 92223

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO

PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP FILED BY KATRINA ANN CORLIS ON 12/08/15 (BANNING)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY KATRINA ANN CORLIS IS GRANTED; CLERK BA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: FI

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: FILING PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION.

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER CO

ANSWER TO UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP BY KATRINA ANN CORLIS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER FILED. ($10,000 OR UNDER)

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF AN

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ANSWER TO UD ON HG LONG AND ASSOC WITH A MAILING DATE OF 12/10/15 FILED. (NON-COMPLAINT)

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO KAY CORLIS; AND MAILED ON 12/06/15 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 12/06/15 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-

REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AS TO KAY CORLIS FILED.

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UD TRIAL.

COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MA

COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER DATED 01/14/16.

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING REGARDING RULING ON SUBMITTED UNLAWFUL DETAINER MATTER

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING REGARDING RULING ON SUBMITTED UNLAWFUL DETAINER MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT'S RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER DATED 01/14/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • RULING ON MATTER SUBMITTED 01/11/16 RE: UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 1/13/16, AT 1:30 IN DEPT. B201 - RESCHEDULED TO:.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER SET FOR 1/13/16, AT 1:30 IN DEPT. B303.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • COURT TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER - BANNING; Disposition: Taken Under Submissio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: OF UD TRIAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP AS TO KAY CORLIS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL-UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP - BANNING (FORM UD-150).

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP DEEMED SERVED ON KATRINA ANN CORLIS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/08/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 12/04/2015 OF MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP FILED BY KATRINA ANN CORLIS ON 12/08/15 (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92223.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 2/02/16 AT 8:30 IN BCLRK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT B201 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (BANNING)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOBILE HOME GROUP II LP is a litigant