This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 02/02/2017 at 12:37:47 (UTC).

M&M VS KORETOFF

Case Summary

On 04/12/2016 M M filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against KORETOFF. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Murrieta Southwest Justice Center located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0617

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

BRITTANY LEIGH KORETOFF

Other

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE O'CONNOR

3691 Adams St.

Riverside, CA 92504

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DET

COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DET

SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FO

CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, U

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRITTANY LEIGH KORETOFF WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/13/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT O

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO BRITTANY LEIGH KORETOFF FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE O

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/13/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK -

JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/29/16

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR R

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSU

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UN

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2016
  • DATE TO SEND NOTICE RE OSC ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED UNSATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR RIVERSIDE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • --ALSO ENTRY OF DEFAULT ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO ALL DEFENDANTS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)--

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY CLERK - POSSESSION ONLY FILED 04/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S), WITH POSTING AND MAILING DATE OF 04/13/16 FILED(ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERKS DEFAULT JUDGMENT (DEFAULT BY CLERK PREVIOUSLY ENTERED) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT ONLY ON THE UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AS TO BRITTANY LEIGH KORETOFF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS, UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION AS TO BRITTANY LEIGH KORETOFF WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/13/16 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER AND NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENTS FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • HEARING RE: UD OSC SET 6/13/16 AT 8:00 IN CLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED 04/12/2016 OF M&M ADVANCE INVESTMENTS LLC AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92592.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED - UNLAWFUL DETAINER UNDER $10,000.(SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT S205 - UNLAWFUL DETAINER. (SOUTHWEST)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF BARRY LEE OCONNOR