This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 01/09/2020 at 01:15:46 (UTC).

MITCHUM VS WOLFIN

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 MITCHUM filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WOLFIN. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Palm Springs Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3497

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Palm Springs Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MITCHUM

ALLEXANNE MITCHUM

Defendants

WOLFIN

MATTHEW WAYRYNEN

DAVID WOLFIN

DEBORAH WOLFIN

LISA WAYRYNEN

JEFFREY STANTON

JOAN WOLFIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER

725 South Figueroa St 31 Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5524

Defendant Attorney

SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP

444 South Flower St Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

 

Court Documents

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEM

AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM

FILED: STATUS UPDATE IN ADVANC

FILED: STATUS UPDATE IN ADVANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM

FILED: RESP OF BOIS SCHILLER F

FILED: RESP OF BOIS SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP TO 10/15/19 OSC WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED

ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS; HON

ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS; HONORABLE JUDGE DAVID M. CHAPMAN.

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEP

NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 11/19/19.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM AND FILED.

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERV

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM BY DEBORAH WOLFIN, LISA WAYRYNEN, MATTHEW WAYRYNEN REPRESENTED BY SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM BY JEFFREY STANTON REPRESENTED BY SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/2

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM BY JOAN WOLFIN, DAVID WOLFIN REPRESENTED BY SMITH GAMBRELL & RUSSELL LLP FILED. (OVER $25,000.00)

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JEFFREY STANTON

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

RESPONSE TO DEFS MOTION TO DIS

RESPONSE TO DEFS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/15/19.

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERV

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL - RES98137; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR ALLEXANNE MITCHUM BY BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (NOTICED); Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketALLEXANNE MITCHUM/BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE, IF ANY, WHY SANCTIONS NOT TO EXCEED $1500.00 OR DISMISSAL SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT ORDER OF 10/15/19.; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketHEARING RESERVED FOR: MOTION TO DISMISS - RES97386; Disposition: Calendared (Reservation Hearings)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketHEARING RE: MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO SUBSTITUTE BY JOAN WOLFIN, DAVID WOLFIN, DEBORAH WOLFIN, LISA WAYRYNEN, MATTHEW WAYRYNEN, JEFFREY STANTON; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketPOS TIMELY/WAIVED - PROOF OF SERVICE ON MOTION TO/FOR DISMISS COMPLAIINT FOR FAILURE TO SUB ON CALENDAR 01/07/20 IS TIMELY/WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER LLP TO OSC BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketESUBMIT FEE BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL FOR ALLEXANNE MITCHUM BY BOIES SCHILLER FLEXNER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
62 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2019
  • DocketFAX FILING BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketFAX FILING BY ALLEXANNE MITCHUM ($2.00 PER PAGE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Docket--ALSO SERVED COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM ON JEFFREY STANTON WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/24/19 --

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/22/2019 OF ALLEXANNE MITCHUM AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 9/19/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLKP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92264.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT PS2. (PALM SPRINGS)

    Read MoreRead Less