This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/10/2019 at 01:21:35 (UTC).

MISSION RANCH MASTER VS BENNETT

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 MISSION RANCH MASTER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BENNETT. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4084

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Moreno Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Defendant

JOHN BENNETT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORENO VALLEY FILED 12/20/2018 OF MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIROSCHULMAN &RABKIN

AUTHORIZATION FOR MELISSA PARK

AUTHORIZATION FOR MELISSA PARKER TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION FILED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIM

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS

PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORENO VALLEY FILED 12/20/2018 OF MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION SERVED ON JOHN BENNETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $69.00.

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500

PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (MORENO VALLEY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED; ORANGE COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • RETURNED DOCUMENT: WRIT OF EXECUTION SUBMITTED BY MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORENO VALLEY FILED 12/20/2018 OF MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION REMOVE ATTORNEY PRO/PER FOR PARTY(S) MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION AND REPLACE WITH ATTORNEY WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIROSCHULMAN &RABKIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION FOR MELISSA PARKER TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING (MORENO VALLEY); Disposition: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE-SMALL CLAIMS ON THE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - MORENO VALLEY FILED 12/20/2018 OF MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION SERVED ON JOHN BENNETT WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/28/18 FILED. (PERSONAL SERVICE) SERVICE FEE OF $69.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • CLAIM AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED - MORENO VALLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • ACTIVE MILITARY DUTY AS TO NONE (MORENO VALLEY).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING SET ON 2/13/19 AT 13:00 IN DEPARTMENT.MV2 - MORENO VALLEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM - OVER $1500 AND LESS THAN OR EQUAL TO $5000 FILED. (MORENO VALLEY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS CASE ASSIGNMENT TO DEPARTMENT MV2. (MORENO VALLEY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less