This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 11:16:50 (UTC).

MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION vs BULLAG

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION filed an Other lawsuit against BULLAG. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Moreno Valley Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is David E. Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0073

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

David E. Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Defendants

JENNIFER BULLAG

CYRIL V BULLAG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel M Medioni

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

08/23/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

08/23/2021: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

Declaration of Andrew Juarez in Support of Default Judgment

08/23/2021: Declaration of Andrew Juarez in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Daniel Medioni in Support of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Sections 585, 1033 and 1033.5

08/23/2021: Declaration of Daniel Medioni in Support of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Sections 585, 1033 and 1033.5

Certificate of Mailing

09/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

09/30/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

03/26/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

03/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default (CIV-100) on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Notice of Pendency of Action

03/10/2021: Notice of Pendency of Action

Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

04/05/2021: Notice of Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Default Judgment (CRC 3.110)

Notice of Document Return.

02/26/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Notice of Document Return.

01/13/2021: Notice of Document Return.

Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

12/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

12/16/2020: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

12/16/2020: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Notice of Department Assignment

11/10/2020: Notice of Department Assignment

Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

11/10/2020: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

10/15/2020: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingType: Order to appear and show cause, if any, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file default judgment (CRC 3.110) as to MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Continued Hearing Not Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: David E. Gregory; Location/Courtroom: Department MV1; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Daniel Medioni in Support of Default Judgment and Award of Attorneys Fees Pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Sections 585, 1033 and 1033.5; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Declaration of Andrew Juarez in Support of Default Judgment; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Entry of Default Judgment. (Default Previously Entered)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Request for Dismissal; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketStatus: Receive and Forward; Description: Default Court Judgment Packet; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Order to Show Cause why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to file Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Telephonic Appearance for Hearing on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Limited complaint or other first paper amount up to $10,000 (GC70613B); Amount: $255.00; Paid: $255.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 11/10/2020; Fine Description: Check #008635 Receipt No.: 20201110-00267.1; Paid: $255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Department Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Notice of Trial Setting Conference - Limited Civil on Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel.; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000); Filed By: MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketFilings: Complaint for Other Complaint (Under $10,000) of MISSION RANCH MASTER ASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less