Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 05/21/2021 at 13:02:00 (UTC).

MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS vs HERNS CONSTRUCTION

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HERNS CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniel Ottolia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3827

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

Judge Details

Judge

Daniel Ottolia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Defendants

HERNS CONSTRUCTION

JULIAN HERNANDEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANGIUS & TERRY LLP

Attorney at ANGIUS & TERRY LLP

3001 Lava Ridge Court Ste 130

Roseville, CA 95661

Defendant Attorney

James J Orland

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing

03/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing

Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

03/23/2021: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

Case Management Statement

03/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

03/10/2021: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

12/24/2020: Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

11/17/2020: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Amended Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

11/12/2020: Amended Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

11/06/2020: Proof of Service on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

Summons Issued on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

10/30/2020: Summons Issued on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

Notice of posting jury fees by MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS.

10/19/2020: Notice of posting jury fees by MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS.

Summons Issued on Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

09/28/2020: Summons Issued on Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

09/28/2020: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

09/28/2020: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • HearingType: Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • HearingType: Case Management Conference Hearing (Riverside); Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • HearingType: Court on its Own Motion; Judicial Officer: Daniel Ottolia; Location/Courtroom: Department 4; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Certificate of Mailing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Generated; Description: Minute Order: Court on its Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement; Filed By: HERNS CONSTRUCTION; JULIAN HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Case Management Statement on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS; Filed By: MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3811775 Receipt No.: 20201230-00081.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited response: answer or other first paper filed by each party other than plaintiff amount over $25,000 including UD; includes response by party to petition for relief in discovery dispute related to out-of-state case (GC70612); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 12/30/2020; Fine Description: Check #D3811775 Receipt No.: 20201230-00081.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Answer to First Amended Complaint on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS; Filed By: HERNS CONSTRUCTION; JULIAN HERNANDEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS Filed. (AMENDED COMPLAINT - SUPERIOR COURT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketFilings: 1st Amended Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Jury Fee Deposit; Amount: $150.00; Paid: $150.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 10/22/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #1503 Receipt No.: CV201022-0213-FE.1; Paid: $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Notice of posting jury fees by MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS.; Filed By: MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • FinancialCASE LEDGER; Fee/Fine Description: Unlimited complaint or other first paper in unlimited civil case amount over $25,000 including UD over $25K, petition for writ of review, mandate, or prohibition; petition for a decree of change of name or gender (GC70611); Amount: $450.00; Paid: $450.00; Balance: $0.00; Payment Details; Payment Date: 09/30/2020; Fine Description: Check Bank Adjustment #1511 Receipt No.: CV200930-0036-FE.1; Paid: $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Summons Issued on Complaint of MISSION VILLAS RIVERSIDE HOMEOWNERS and filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Certificate of Counsel filed. The zip code is 92508.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatus: Filed; Description: Complaint Filed Fast Track. (Riverside)

    Read MoreRead Less