This case was last updated from Riverside County Superior Courts on 10/24/2020 at 05:22:37 (UTC).

MIRAMONTES VS ANDY MANAGEMENT GROUP

Case Summary

On 09/22/2020 MIRAMONTES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ANDY MANAGEMENT GROUP. This case was filed in Riverside County Superior Courts, Riverside Historic Courthouse located in Riverside, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3737

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Riverside County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Riverside Historic Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Riverside, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARLENE MIRAMONTES

Defendants

ANDY MANAGEMENT GROUP

METROPOLITAN FAMILY MEDICAL CLINIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMAILI & ASSOCIATES PC

600 W Santa Ana Blvd #202

Santa Ana, CA 92701

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF R

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF MARLENE MIRAMONTES AS TO ANDY MANAGEMENT GROUP WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/19/20

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NO

SYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (R

COMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARLENE MIRAMONTES IS GRANTED; CLERK C NAKAGAWA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FI

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF MARLENE MIRAMONTES AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2021
  • HearingDept: 04; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • HearingDept: CLER; Action text: NON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE CLERK'S TRACKING HEARING (NON-APPEARANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF MARLENE MIRAMONTES AS TO ANDY MANAGEMENT GROUP WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 10/19/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSYSTEM GENERATED NOTICE RE: NOTICE OF DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 04. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED FAST TRACK. (RIVERSIDE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MARLENE MIRAMONTES (FORM FW-001).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketNON-PROOF OF SERVICE HEARING SET FOR 1/20/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT CLER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER FILED BY MARLENE MIRAMONTES IS GRANTED; CLERK C NAKAGAWA (GRANTED) FORM FW-003.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL FILED. THE ZIP CODE IS 92504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FOR MARLENE MIRAMONTES WAS GRANTED FOR INITIAL FILING FEE; $450.00 WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/22/2020 OF MARLENE MIRAMONTES AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less